Novel Factor Ix Purification Methods
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08953143
Examiner Anish Gupta, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Foster, W. Barry, Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin N. Ainsworth +1 212 692 6745 +1 212 983 3115 kainsworth@mintz.com
Space Elizabeth Barnhard +1 914 821 3074
Space Rebecca Barrett +1 302 885 8907
Space Ingrid Beattie +1 617 348 1838
Space William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space Egon Berg +1 201 452 2449
Space NAOMI S. BISWAS +1 617 348 4401
Space Duane Blake +1 781 492 2361
Space William Calnan +1 203 847 3308
Space Milagros Cepeda +1 973 998 7722
Space Yongsuck Choi +1 202 496 7647
Space David Franklin Crosby +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 dcrosby@mintz.com
Space Brett N. Dorny +1 508 709 0501 +1 508 519 9185 bndorny@dornylaw.com
Space MARIANNE MCLAUGHLIN DOWNING +1 781 401 9988
Space Steven Eck +1 206 792 3021
Space Bruce Eisen +1 561 218 4367
Space Ivor R. Elrifi +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ielrifi@mintz.com
Space HEIDI A. ERLACHER +1 617 348 4909
Space Steven Flynn +1 304 554 5657
Space Christina Gadiano +1 571 277 8278
Space Richard Gervase +1 212 692 6755
Space Alan Gordon +1 443 743 1143
Space Barbara Gyure +1 617 309 2614
Space John Andrew Harre +1 617 542 6000
Space +1 973 942 0404
Space Brian Patrick Hopkins +1 212 692 6800 brianphopkins@yahoo.com
Space Shane Hunter +1 858 480 5530
Space Elizabeth Hurley +1 781 464 2001
Space David Johnson +1 617 500 2508 david.johnson@pillsburylaw.com
Space Krishna Kalidindi +1 703 893 8500
Space ROBERT V. KLAUZINSKI +1 781 377 8645
Space Kristin Konzak +1 617 871 3216
Space Cynthia Kozakiewicz +1 617 542 6000
Space Adley Mandel +1 973 660 7659
Space Barry Marenberg +1 908 458 1361
Space William A. Marino +1 617 859 2702
Space Gale Matthews +1 919 659 3926
Space Arnold Milowsky +1 610 873 5474
Space Anthony Jason Mirabito +1 617 542 6000 +1 617 542 2241 ajmirabito@mintz.com
Space Daniel Moran +1 845 357 2274
Space Michael Nagy +1 484 865 8616
Space Bradley Olson +1 202 654 4539
Space Carol Peters +1 617 348 4914
Space David Poirier +1 617 456 8262
Space Michael Timothy Renaud +1 617 348 1870 +1 617 542 2241 mtrenaud@mintz.com
Space Barbara Renda +1 973 660 7653
Space BRIAN S. ROSENBLOOM +1 202 783 6040
Space M Ryan +1 413 424 7630
Space ROBERT J. SAYRE. +1 617 401 2460
Space CHRISTINA K. STOCK +1 617 348 1817
Space THOMAS SULLIVAN, +1 617 395 7000
Space Janine Susan +1 617 345 3275
Space Howard J. Susser +1 617 542 6000
Space GEORGE TARNOWSKI +1 610 584 4742
Space SHELBY J. WALKER +1 508 870 5252
Space Darryl Webster +1 301 556 9900
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Foster, W. Barry, Chelmsford, MA (US)
Filing Date October 17, 1997
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 22058-511CON (GI-5246)
Confirmation Number 3449
Group Art Unit 1654
Class / Sub-Class 530 / 384
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Assignments (1) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
        Receipt into Pubs
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
          Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
            Receipt into Pubs
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
              Workflow - Customer Service Request - Begin
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                Issue Fee Payment Verified
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Issue Fee Payment Received
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Reverse Issue Fee
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Workflow - Customer Service Request - Finish
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Receipt into Pubs
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Receipt into Pubs
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Receipt into Pubs
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Dispatch to Publications
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Mail Examiner's Amendment
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Mail Notice of Allowance
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Mail Notification of Terminal Disclaimer - Accepted
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Examiner's Amendment Communication
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Notification of Terminal Disclaimer - Accepted
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Terminal Disclaimer Filed
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 11/5/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 11/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Non-Final Rejection
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Mail-Petition to Revive Application - Granted
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Correspondence Address Change
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        Petition Entered
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Mail Abandonment for Failure to Respond to Office Action
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Aband. for Failure to Respond to O. A.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                  Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                        Amendment after Final Rejection
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                            Final Rejection
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                              Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                    Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 2/25/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                      Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 2/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                          Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 1/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                              Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/10/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 32 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?