Magnetic Field Pulsed Laser Depostion Of Thin Films

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08982666
Examiner Bernard D Pianalto, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Bernard D Pianalto
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Radhakrishnan, Gouri, Applicant

Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Radhakrishnan, Gouri, Culver City, CA (US)
Filing Date December 2, 1997
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-332
Confirmation Number 9582
Group Art Unit 1762
Class / Sub-Class 427 / 571
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Letter Restarting Period for Response (i.e. Letter re: References)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Restarted Response Period
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?