System And Method For Enabling A Caller To Selectively Leave A Message On A Telephone Without Ringing The Telephone
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08987676
Examiner Scott Louis Weaver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Borland, David, Applicant
Officer/Director, C3, Inc.
Officer/Director, Telos Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by RPX Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darryl Adams +1 512 322 2583
Space Kevin Daffer +1 512 476 1400
Space Paul Drake +1 512 516 9218
Space Gerald Fisher +1 650 329 9293
Space Harold Fujii +1 408 352 4540
Space Jeffrey Hood +1 512 853 8820
Space Noel Kivlin +1 512 853 8800
Space Lawrence Merkel +1 512 853 8800
Space Eric Meyertons +1 512 853 8800
Space Louise Miller +1 512 476 1400
Space Vincenzo Pitruzzella +1 760 668 6489
Space Charles Quarton +1 484 552 8683
Space Louis Riley +1 512 228 5640
Space Richard Roddy +1 919 363 7258
Space David Rose +1 713 238 8000
Space Eric A. Stephenson +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250
Space William II Zahrt +1 408 658 1535
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Borland, David, Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date December 9, 1997
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 154.P053
Confirmation Number 6587
Group Art Unit 2748
Class / Sub-Class 379 / 373
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Assignments (9) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
        Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
          Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
            Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
              Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                Issue Fee Payment Verified
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Workflow - Drawings Finished
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Correspondence Address Change
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Response after Non-Final Action
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 12/8/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Correspondence Address Change
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Non-Final Rejection
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?