Stand Alone Electronic Mail Notifying Device

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09004428
Examiner Roland G Foster, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Roland G Foster
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Tyroler, Dan, Applicant

Represented by Meyertons, Hood, Kivlin, Kowert & Goetzel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Brightwell +1 512 853 8823
Space Jason Burgess +1 512 476 1400
Space Kay Colapret +1 512 853 8881
Space Alexander Courtade +1 512 853 8800
Space STEPHEN J. CURRAN +1 512 853 8800
Space Michael Davis +1 512 786 7863
Space Mark DeLuca +1 512 853 8880
Space Arundhoti Ghatak-Roy +1 512 853 8835
Space Ann Harwood +1 512 853 8852
Space ERIK A. HETER +1 512 853 8800
Space JEFFREY C. HOOD +1 512 853 8820
Space John Keller +1 512 853 8862
Space Brandon Kennedy +1 512 472 9881
Space Noel Kivlin +1 512 853 8800
Space ROBERT C. KOWERT +1 512 853 8800
Space Stephen Mason +1 512 853 8826
Space LAWRENCE J. MERKEL +1 512 853 8800
Space Eric Bryant Meyertons +1 512 853 8800 +1 512 853 8801 emeyertons@intprop.com
Space Dean M. Munyon +1 512 853 8800
Space Neal Persky +1 512 853 8800
Space ANTHONY M. PETRO +1 512 853 8800
Space RORY D. RANKIN +1 512 853 8800
Space Gareth Sampson +1 512 853 8800
Space Paul Seegers +1 512 853 8878
Space Joel Stevens +1 512 853 8882
Space CHRIS D. THOMPSON +1 512 853 8877
Space Matthew Washburn +1 512 853 8856
Space MARK S. WILLIAMS +1 512 853 8825
Space Eric Wingrove +1 512 853 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Tyroler, Dan, Great Neck, NY (US)
Filing Date January 8, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 6057-37300
Confirmation Number 1207
Group Art Unit 2645
Class / Sub-Class 379 / 93
Timeline
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/2/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for CPA - Begin
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for CPA - Finish
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Supplemental Response
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Continuing Prosecution Application - Continuation (ACPA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Express Abandonment (During Examination)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Express Abandonment (during Examination)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Advisory Action (PTOL - 303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Advisory Action (PTOL-303)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/27/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 4 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?