Nrz And Biphase-l Formatted Hexaphase Modulated Gps Transmission Method

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09014471
Examiner Shuwang Liu, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Shuwang Liu
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Raghavan, Srinivasa H., Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Raghavan, Srinivasa H., Rancho Palos Verdes, CA (US)
Filing Date January 28, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-327
Confirmation Number 4541
Group Art Unit 2734
Class / Sub-Class 375 / 200
Timeline
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/11/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Secrecy Order Rescinded
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Secrecy Order Imposed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/13/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 11 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?