Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/20/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |