Micromachined Monolithic Reflector Antenna System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09028584
Examiner Jennifer H Malos, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Jennifer H Malos
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Yarbrough, Allyson D., Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Yarbrough, Allyson D., Hermosa Beach, CA (US)
Filing Date February 18, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-334A
Confirmation Number 4893
Group Art Unit 2821
Class / Sub-Class 343 / 700
Timeline
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming petition IFW
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?