Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/20/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
UnMatched Papers in Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Incoming Correspondence - Finish
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Incoming Correspondence - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Transfer Inquiry
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/12/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |