Recognition Of Sequential Data Using Finite State Finite State Sequence Models Organized In A Tree Structure

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09031881
Examiner Donald L Storm, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Donald L Storm
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Robinson, Anthony John, Applicant

Represented by Schwegman, Lundberg & Woessner, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Anglin +1 952 432 6670
Space TIMOTHY L. BIANCHI +1 612 373 6900
Space PATRICK G. BILLIG +1 612 573 2003
Space RICHARD W. BILLION +1 952 697 2630
Space THOMAS F. BRENNAN +1 612 373 6900
Space Edward Brooks +1 612 236 0120
Space Barbara J. Clark +1 515 233 3865
Space P.A., EDUARDO E. DRAKE +1 612 437 1773
Space MICHAEL D. DRYJA +1 480 463 4837
Space JANET F. EMBRETSON +1 612 373 6900
Space David N. Fogg +1 952 465 0770
Space Bradley Forrest +1 612 373 6900
Space Robert Harris +1 952 876 4092
Space Rudolph Hofmann +1 612 573 2000
Space SHERYL SUE HOLLOWAY +1 408 720 8300
Space CATHERINE L. KLIMA-SILBERG +1 847 277 1465
Space DANIEL L. KLUTH +1 612 373 6900
Space CHARLES A. LEMAIRE +1 952 435 0201
Space MARK A. LITMAN +1 612 965 3755
Space Steven Lundberg +1 612 373 6900
Space Andres Madrid +1 203 921 2844
Space MICHAEL L. SCHWEGMAN +1 612 373 6901
Space PAUL B. SIMBOLI +1 650 462 5900
Space RUSSELL D. SLIFER +1 208 368 2940
Space Ann Viksnins +1 952 876 4091
Space WARREN D. WOESSNER. +1 612 373 6903
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Robinson, Anthony John, Cambridge (GB)
Filing Date February 27, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 491.015US1
Confirmation Number 9246
Group Art Unit 2741
Class / Sub-Class 704 / 254
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Corrected Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Corrected Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Preliminary Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Foreign Priority (Priority Papers May Be Included)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?