Msk Spread-spectrum Receiver Which Allows Cdma Operations

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09039506
Examiner Tesfaldet Bocure, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Tesfaldet Bocure
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Omura, Jimmy K., Applicant

Represented by Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALOYSIUS T.D. AUYEUNG +1 503 222 9981
Space Gillian Bunker +1 503 796 2998
Space Charles Burrell +1 503 796 2099
Space Kevin Dothager +1 206 407 1513
Space Ryan Fox-Lee +1 503 796 2446
Space NATHAN R. MAKI +1 503 222 9981
Space Michael Moore +1 503 796 2883
Space Devon Zastrow Newman +1 503 796 2944 +1 503 796 2900 dnewman@schwabe.com
Space Wesley Parker +1 503 381 6385
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 503 222 9981 +1 503 796 2900 pheuser@schwabe.com
Space STEVEN J. PREWITT +1 503 796 2844
Space Vladimir Raskin +1 206 622 1711
Space Jo Schmidt +1 206 407 1569
Space Brantley C. Shumaker +1 503 796 2471 +1 503 796 2900 bshumaker@schwabe.com
Space Kimvi T. To +1 503 796 2402 +1 503 796 2900 kto@schwabe.com
Space Linda Zachariah +1 206 407 1561
Space Laura Zager +1 503 796 2864
Space Feng Zhao 1 +1 +1 +1
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Omura, Jimmy K., Cupertino, CA (US)
Filing Date March 16, 1998
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number CYLN32US
Confirmation Number 9667
Group Art Unit 2731
Class / Sub-Class 375 / 207
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Assignments (12) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Approved in TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Preexamination Location Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?