Automatic Message Interpretation And Routing System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09054233
Examiner Anil Khatri, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Anil Khatri
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rice, Amy, Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Berman +1 703 370 4800
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Leila Naghibi +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh X. Nguyen +1 703 370 4800 jbarsky@hershkovitz.net
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Space Joseph Scafetta +1 703 370 4800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Rice, Amy, Ridgefield, CT (US)
Filing Date April 2, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P66337
Confirmation Number 2279
Group Art Unit 2122
Class / Sub-Class 706 / 47
Timeline
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Assignments (12) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None Prosecution - SOL.NTC.SUIT
Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.DEC.PUBS
Petition decision routed to the Office of Publications to act on the decision or continue prosecution. (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PETDEC
Petition Decision (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.OP
Petition for review by the Office of Petitions. (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - 136A
Authorization for Extension of Time all replies (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Prosecution - PET.STATUS
Petition for review/processing depending on status (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None 1 - COCOUT
Certificate of Correction - Post Issue Communication (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - N570
Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - COCX
SPE Response - Return for Certificate of Correction (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - IMIS
Miscellaneous Internal Document (1 Page)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None Prosecution - COCIN
Request for Certificate of Correction (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - APPENDIX
Appendix to the Specification (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Withdrawal Patent Case from Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (3 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - EXIN
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413) (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Approved in TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Filed
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (6 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (7 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - DIST
Terminal Disclaimer Filed (4 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (8 Pages)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (23 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NFDR
Notice of Formal Drawings Required (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - NOA
Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (4 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None 1 - SRNT
Examiner's search strategy and results (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - CTMS
Miscellaneous Action with SSP (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - XT/
Extension of Time (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - PA..
Power of Attorney (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Request for RCE - Finish
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CTFR
Final Rejection (16 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/25/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - REM
Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (6 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - A...
Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - NPL
Non Patent Literature (9 Pages)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - 892
List of references cited by examiner (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Prosecution - CTNF
Non-Final Rejection (15 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (5 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFR
Applicant Response to Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - PEFN
Pre-Exam Formalities Notice (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/30/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - WFEE
Fee Worksheet (SB06) (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - BIB
Bibliographic Data Sheet (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - OATH
Oath or Declaration filed (2 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - ABST
Abstract (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - CLM
Claims (11 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - SPEC
Specification (19 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - DRW
Drawings-only black and white line drawings (3 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - TRNA
Transmittal of New Application (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - FWCLM
Index of Claims (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - SRFW
Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Prosecution - IIFW
Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (1 Page)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/1998, Entered: None Pacr - LET.
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (37 Pages)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 13 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?