System Processing Unit Extended With Programmable Logic For Plurality Of Functions
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09102465
Examiner Jibreel Speight, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Borland, David J., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gambrell, Wilson & Hamilton, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darryl Adams +1 512 322 2583
Space Elizabeth Apperley +1 512 602 5522
Space Mark Berrier +1 512 306 9200
Space Daniel Christen +1 425 707 8597
Space Kevin Daffer +1 512 476 1400
Space Paul Drake +1 512 516 9218
Space JEFFREY C. HOOD +1 512 853 8820
Space Noel Kivlin +1 512 853 8800
Space Robert Kowert +1 512 853 8800
Space Lawrence Merkel +1 512 853 8800
Space Eric Meyertons +1 512 853 8800
Space Louise Miller +1 512 476 1400
Space Vincenzo Pitruzzella +1 760 668 6489
Space Charles Quarton +1 484 552 8683
Space Louis Riley +1 512 228 5640
Space Richard Roddy +1 919 363 7258
Space David Rose +1 713 238 8000
Space Eric A. Stephenson +1 512 476 1400 +1 512 703 1250
Space J Tortolano +1 408 284 2731
Space Rita Wisor +1 512 301 1680
Space William II Zahrt +1 408 658 1535
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Borland, David J., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date June 22, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 5000-96500
Confirmation Number 1839
Group Art Unit 2825
Class / Sub-Class 716 / 17
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Assignments (9) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
        Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
          Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
            Issue Fee Payment Verified
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
              Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Mail Notice of Allowance
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Response after Non-Final Action
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Non-Final Rejection
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 9/1/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 6/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 10/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Transfer Inquiry
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/8/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Initial Exam Team nn
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Workflow - Drawings Finished
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?