Island Ready-Mix Con v. Cement, Quarry Worke, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00126-DAE-LEK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Island Ready-Mix Concrete, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Banner & Witcoff, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Katz +1 202 824 3181 +1 202 824 3001 rkatz@bannerwitcoff.com
v.
No Logo Cement, Quarry Workers, Ready Mix and Dump Truck Drivers, Local 681 Affiliated With The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen W. Hanabusa +5235 523 523 5777 +5991 599 599 1814 hanac841@yahoo.com
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Partnership 1-1, Defendant
No Logo Renee Rego, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colleen W. Hanabusa +5235 523 523 5777 +5991 599 599 1814 hanac841@yahoo.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 2/11/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Honolulu
Terminated 5/17/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case Civil00-1-0203-1[Circuit Ct 1st Cir]
Def Custody Status
Flags REMAND, TERMED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: 6/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi granting motion to award pltf attys fees & general excise tax totaling $2,604.15 & no costs [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
    MEMORANDUM by defendant Cement, Quarry Worke, defendant Renee Rego in opposition to plaintiff's declaration of counsel in support of plaintiff's Island Ready-Mix Concrete, Inc.' motion to remand to State Court, filed March 3, 2000; exhibits "1"-"3"; declaration of Colleen Hanabuse; certificate of service [11-1] - re atty fees and costs (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi granting plaintiff Island Ready-Mix Concrete, Inc.'s motion to remand to state court [4-1] filed March 3, 2000 (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        DECLARATION OF COUNSEL by plaintiff Island Ready-Mix Con in support of motion to remand to state court [4-1] filed March 3, 2000; exhibits "a" through "c"; certificate of service - regarding attorneys fees and costs (eps) Modified on 04/14/2000
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP : pltf's motion to remand to state court - arguments heard; motion to remand to state court [4-1] - granted; court also grants award of attorneys fees and costs; court directs pltfs to submit the necessary afdts by 4/13/00, opposition, if any is due 4/24/00; pltf to draft order ( Ct Rptr : Tape) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Island Ready-Mix Con in support of motion to remand to state court [4-1] filed March 3, 2000; declaration of counsel; exhibits "a" and "b"; certificate of service (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by defendant Cement, Quarry Worke, defendant Renee Rego in opposition to plaintiff's motion to remand to state court [4-1]; certificate of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 Notice of Hearing.
                NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on motion to remand to state court [4-1] 10:30 4/6/00 (LEK) (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra referring to Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi the motion to remand to state court [4-1] - purs to 28:636(b)(1)(A) & LR 72.3 (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000, Terminated: 4/24/2000 Motion to Remand
                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Island Ready-Mix Con to remand to state court ; memorandum in support of motion to remand to state court; declaration of counsel; exhibits "a" and "b"; certificate of service (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/18/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Answer
                      ANSWER by defendant Cement, Quarry Worke, defendant Renee Rego to [1-1]; certificate of service (wnn)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 5/15/00 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 Notice of Removal
                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL; exhibit "a"; certificate of service - from Circuit Ct 1st Circuit Case Number: Civil 00-1-0203-01 (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000 Remark
                            FILING FEE PAID $150.00 receipt #192825 (fe)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 80 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?