John Wagner Associat v. Ash Painting, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00207-DAE
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Wagner Associates, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
v.
No Logo Amwest Surety Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Ash Painting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo John Phelps, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 3/15/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 130 - Contract - Surety
Cause Section 40 U.S.C. § 270 Miller Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 4/12/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: 4/13/2000 Notice of Dismissal
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed herein on March 15, 2000 with prejudice; certificate of service - by plaintiff John Wagner Associat (sealed)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Service - Miscellaneous
    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant John Phelps thru Susan Phelps on 3/18/00 - (confirmed service with David Farmer on 3/22/00) (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/22/2000 Service - Miscellaneous
      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Ash Painting, Inc. thru Susan Phelps, president on 3/18/00 (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 6/19/00 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Complaint
          COMPLAINT; exhibits "a"-"d"; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 Remark
            FILING FEE PAID $150.00 receipt #193512 (fe)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 702 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?