Radtke v. Air Force, The Depar, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00362-DAE-FIY
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard L. Radtke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn A. Luiz +5380 538 538 0500 attorneyluiz@msn.com
v.
No Logo Air Force, The Department of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo F. Whitten Peters, Defendant
No Logo Michael E. Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Michael Hatch, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/22/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/2/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : terminating case pursuant to RUle 41(a)(1)(ii) (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION for compromise settlement and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : The Court was informed by plaintiff's counsel that the parties have settled; the cross motions for summary jugments now set for 7/18/2000 is vacated; stipulations of compromised settlement to follow. [4-1]; [3-1] ( Ct Rptr : JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: 7/17/2000 Reply
        REPLY by defendant Air Force, The Depar to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [4-1]; certificate of service (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Description not available
          DECLARATION by defendant Air Force, The Depar of Michael E. Hatch; certificate of service re [4-1] (tbf)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 7/11/2000, Entered: 7/13/2000 Affidavit
            Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Richard L. Radtke; exhibit "a"; certificate of service - by pltf re [4-1], re [3-1] (tbf)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Miscellaneous Document
              Concise STATEMENT by defendant Air Force, The Depar; certificate of service - in support of motion for summary judgment [4-1] (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Richard L. Radtke in opposition to defendants' cross motion for summary judgment [4-1], and REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [3-1]; declaration of counsel; certificate of service (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 6/30/2000 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  OPPOSITION by defendant Air Force, The Depar to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [3-1]; attachments 1-2; certificate of service (eps) Modified on 06/30/2000
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 6/30/2000, Terminated: 7/14/2000 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION and cross motion by defendant Air Force, The Depar for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of cross-motion for summary judgment - set for 3:00 7/18/00 before Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/26/2000 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Richard L. Radtke for preliminary injunction ; memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for summary injunction; affidavit of Richard L. Radtke; declaration of counsel; exhibits 1-6; certificate of service - set for 3:00 7/18/00 before Mag Judge Francis I. Yamashita (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 8:30 8/21/00 before Mag Judge Francis I. Yamashita (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief; (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 68 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?