Rogers v. Mauna Lani Resort (O
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00680-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laurie Jo Rogers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by hawaiiemploymentrights.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David F. Simons +5363 536 536 3255 dsimons@hawaiiemploymentrights.com
v.
No Logo Mauna Lani Resort (operation), Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G. Mueller +1 202 273 1042 daniel.mueller@nlrb.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
Space John L. Knorek +5236 523 523 6000 jlk@torkildson.com
Space Wayne S. Yoshigai +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 wsy@torkildson.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/18/2000
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hawaii
Terminated 11/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : terminating case (gab)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Answer
    Defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' Answer to First Amended Complaint as filed on 10/30/01; certificate of service (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Stipulation and Order
        STIPULATION to continue hearing on defendant Mauna Lani Resort (operations), Inc. dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' motion for summary judgment or in the alternative to compel arbitration filed 9/28/01 and order [31-1] hearing cont. from 12/10/01 to 9:00 2/4/02 (DAE) (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Amended Complaint
          First AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Laurie Jo Rogers; exhibit 1; demand for jury trial; summons (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
            STIPULATION to file first amended complaint and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang; exhibit 1 (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order 1. Non-jury trial on May 29, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before DAE Wednesday 2. Final Pretrial Conference on April 16, 2002 at 9:00a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 9, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by closed 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by closed 7. File Dispositive Motions by closed 8a. File Motions in Limine by May 7, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 14, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by closed 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by closed 12. Discovery deadline March 29, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for On Call 14. Settlement Conference statements by n/a 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by May 7, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 30, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by May 7, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 14, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by May 7, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 14, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by May 14, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by May 14, 2002 Other Matters: ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO : ; settlement/status conference set for 10/15/01 continued to 9:00 10/22/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang atty Matt Viola to notify defendant's counsel John Knorek. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Description not available
                    Defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' submission of original declarations of Lorna Tsuyemura, Charlene Goo and Susan Bredo; certificate of service (gab)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : Further settlement conference; counsel discussed settlement of this action; status conference regarding settlement set for 9:00 10/15/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record in chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                        Separate Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows in support of motion for summary judgment or in the alternative to compel arbitration [31-1]; declaration of Lorna Tsuyemura; exhibits a, b, c, and d; declaration of charlene Goo; declaration of Susan Bredo; and certificate of service (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' for summary judgment or in the alternative to compel arbitration memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service; set for 9:45 12/10/01 before Judge David A. Ezra (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO : Further settlement conference set for 9/24/2001 continued to 3:00 10/1/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang Defendant's atty John Knorek's secretary to notify all counsel of this continued conference () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EP : settlement conference - counsel and this Court discussed settlement; further settlement continued to 3:00 9/24/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record held in chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001 Witness List
                                Defendant mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc. dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' Designation of expert witnesses; exhibit a; certificate of service (sealed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATED Protective ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang re discovery between defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations), Inc. dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows and plaintiff Laurie Jo Rogers and ORDER (gab)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION to continue pretrial dates and amend scheduling conference ORDER dated 01/24/01 by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : ; settlement/status conference set for 3:00 9/17/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO : ; settlement conference moved from 8/3/01 to 3:00 7/19/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang John Knorek to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Initial Disclosure
                                                            INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by defendant Mauna Lani Resort (O (afc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (afc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                      EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - 1. Jury trial on January 15, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on December 4, 2001 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by November 27, 2001 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by June 15, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by October 17, 2001 7. File Dispositive Motions by August 15, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by December 24, 2001 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 2, 2002 10. The parties shall immediately comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by July 16, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 15, 2001 12. Discovery deadline November 16, 2001 13. Settlement Conference set for August 3, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by July 27, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by January 2, 2002 21. File Final witness list by December 24, 2001 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by December 18, 2001 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by December 24, 2001 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 2, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by December 24, 2001 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 2, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by January 2, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Mauna Lani Resort (O; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                            REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Description not available
                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES AND DAMAGES; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER to complaint filed 10/18/00 by defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operations) Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows' [1-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant Mauna Lani Resort (Operation), Inc., dba Mauna Lani Bay Hotels and Bungalows throughLorna Tsuyemura, Director of Hotel Human Resources and authoritzed agent to accept service for said deft on 10/25/00 (afc)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 8:30 1/22/01 before Mag Judge Francis I. Yamashita (lmg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; consent to sue; summons (issued) (lmg)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?