Glassman, et al v. Bowling, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00810-HG-BMK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kurt S. Glassman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck C. Choi +5331 533 533 1877 cchoi@wcelaw.com
No Logo Susan W. Glassman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by wcelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chuck C. Choi +5331 533 533 1877 cchoi@wcelaw.com
v.
No Logo Edward Bowling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Frances Bowling-Haller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
No Logo Glenda Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashford & Wriston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S. Aoki paoki@awlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C Farmer +1 808 222 3133 +1 866 559 2922 farmerd001@hawaii.rr.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/19/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 4/6/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV00-1-3396-11[Circuit Ct 1st Circu]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Miscellaneous Document
EX PARTE Application by plaintiff Kurt S. Glassman, plaintiff Susan W. Glassman to reopen case (gab)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Description not available
    DECLARATION of Chuck C. Choi in support of Ex parte application to reopen case; exhibit A; by plaintiff Kurt S. Glassman, plaintiff Susan W. Glassman (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER Approving amended stipulation for dismissal without prejudice as to all claims and all parties exhibit A by Judge Helen Gillmor (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
          Amended STIPULATION for dismissal without prejudice as to all claims and all parties by Judge Helen Gillmor : dismissing case (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EO : The Court will treat the Amended Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to All claims and All Parties, lodged on April 17, 2001 and filed on May 2, 2001, as a motion to reopen the case based on error of the parties. The Order Approving Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice as to All Claims and Parties Exhibit "A", filed on April 6, 2001, is VACATED. The Order Approving Amended Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to All Claims and All Parties Exhibit "A" was filed on May 2, 2001. The Complaint and all other claims in Civil No. 00-00810HG-BMK are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor approving stipulation for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties re [8-1]; exhibit a terminating case - on behalf of plaintiffs (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 StipulationCourt Filing
                STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  Withdrawal and substitution of counsel; certificate of service -ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi withdrawing attorney attorney Mark B. Desmarais; adding attorney Chuck Choi for Susan W. Glassman, Kurt S. Glassman on behalf of pltf (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : ; status conference re dismissal set for 9:00 4/9/01 ; all other dates vacated before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jennine from Desmarais' office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Answer
                        ANSWER by defendant Glenda Corporation to complaint; certificate of service [1-1] (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                          FIRST STIPULATION extending time to answer complaint or otherwise plead by Judge Helen Gillmor - by deft (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/27/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Notice of Removal
                              Defendants' NOTICE OF REMOVAL; exhibit a; certificate of service - from Circuit Ct 1st Circuit Case Number: Cv 00-1-3396-11 (fe)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?