Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to Publications
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |