Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/11/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/28/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |