Error-floor Mitigating Turbo Code Communication Method

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09182447
Examiner Temesghen Ghebretinsae, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Temesghen Ghebretinsae
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wang, Charles C., Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Wang, Charles C., Arcadia, CA (US)
Filing Date October 22, 1998
Status Patent Expired Due to NonPayment of Maintenance Fees Under 37 CFR 1.362
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-342
Confirmation Number 2024
Group Art Unit 2734
Class / Sub-Class 375 / 265
Timeline
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Transaction History
Expire Patent
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/30/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Approved in TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Power to Make Copies and/or Inspect
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 9 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?