Channel Arbitration Between Handset And Base Station In A Cordless Telephone System
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09186319
Examiner Tilahun Gesesse, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Hebeler, Steven E., Applicant

Represented by Zagorin O'Brien Graham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Apperley +1 512 602 5522
Space Paul Drake +1 512 516 9218
Space ANDREW C. GRAHAM +1 512 338 6300
Space Louise Miller +1 512 476 1400
Space DAVID W. O'BRIEN +1 512 338 6300
Space Vincenzo Pitruzzella +1 760 668 6489
Space Charles Quarton +1 484 552 8683
Space Louis Riley +1 512 228 5640
Space Richard Roddy +1 919 363 7258
Space J Tortolano +1 408 284 2731
Space RITA M. WISOR +1 512 301 1680
Space MARK ZAGORIN +1 512 338 6300
Space William II Zahrt +1 408 658 1535
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Hebeler, Steven E., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date November 4, 1998
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 1001-P0027-R
Confirmation Number 1644
Group Art Unit 2683
Class / Sub-Class 455 / 450
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Assignments (11) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
        Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
          Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
            Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
              Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 7/22/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Fee Payment Verified
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                      New or Additional Drawing Filed
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Workflow - Drawings Finished
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Mail Notice of Allowance
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Response after Non-Final Action
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Correspondence Address Change
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Correspondence Address Change
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?