Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant - No Action Count
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Miscellaneous Communication to Applicant
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
1.501 Submission by Third Party
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/11/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner's Amendment Communication
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner's Amendment
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/2/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Incoming Letter Pertaining to the Drawings
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Preliminary Amendment
|
|
|
 |