Legg v. Sports Shinko (Waiki, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00002-SPK-LEK
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edith Legg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Krueger +1 808 244 7444
v.
No Logo John Doe Corporations 1-5, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Partnerships 1-5, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Roe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Roe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Sports Shinko (Waikiki) Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ayabe Chong Nishimoto Sia & Nakamura LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney K. Ayabe +1 808 537 6119 +1 808 526 3491 sidney.ayabe@hawadvocate.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 2/19/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all parties and claims; ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King - pursuant to rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the Fed.R.C.P., that the complaint of plaintiff Edith Legg against defendant Sport Shinko (Waikiki) Corporation dba Ocean Resort Hotel Waikiki, is hereby dismissed with prejudice; there are no remaining parties and/or issues to this action; all parties shall bear their on costs - terminating case - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 27 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : ;Further settlement conference held ; settlement on the record held; terms stated; stipulation for dismissal due 2/28/02; trial date and all deadlines are vacated ( Ct Rptr : No record; tape 158-C-335) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : ;Further settlement conference set for 10:30 1/22/02 is continued to 2:00 1/29/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified via conference call ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO : Settlement conf set for 2:00 1/03/02 is continued to 10:30 01/11/02, LEK; Zale Okazaki to notify all parties; ; settlement conference set for 10:30 1/11/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Description not available
            DISCLOSURES OF EXPERT WITNESSES by defendant Sports Shinko (Waikiki); exhibits a an b; certificate of service (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Description not available
              DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plaintiff's; exhibits a-b; certificate of service (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO :Parties are in agreement. New dates given. Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. 1. Jury trial on April 9, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on February 26, 2002 at 9:00a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by February 19, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by N/A 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by January 9, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by N/A 8a. File Motions in Limine by March 19, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 27, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 3, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by January 3, 2002 12. Discovery deadline February 8, 2002 13. Further Settlement Conference set for January 3, 2002 at 2:00 p.m.` before LEK 14. Updated Settlement Conference statements by December 27, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by March 27, 2002 21. File Final witness list by March 19, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by March 12, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by March 19, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by March 27, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by March 19, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 27, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by March 27, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: A copy of the Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties Jury Trial set for 9:00 4/9/02 before Judge Samuel P. King , final pretrial conference set for 9:00 2/26/02 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 1/3/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : ;Further settlement conference set for 2:00 1/3/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/29/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : ;Settlement conference held 10/24/01 ; further settlement conf to be scheduled ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                        NOTICE of hearing ; settlement conference continued from 2:00 10/18/01 to 3:00 10/24/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg) Modified on 10/24/2001
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE of service (lmg) Modified on 10/24/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO : ;Settlement conference set for 2:00 10/18/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Zale Okazaki of Sidney Ayabe's office to notify James Krueger ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EO : ;Settlement conference set for 2:00 8/13/01 LEK is vacated ; settlement conference will be reset at a later date ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/4/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EO: settlement conference set for 2:00 7/2/01 is continued to 2:00 8/13/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified. () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                      NOTICE of hearing ;settlement conference set for 2:00 7/6/02 is continued to 2:00 7/2/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; also: confidential settlement conference statements will now be due on 6/25/01 (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Initial Disclosure
                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURE of witnesses by plaintiff's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Initial Disclosure
                                          INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendant Sports Shinko (Waikiki) Corporation dba Sports Shinko Waikiki Resort Hotel's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EP :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. 1. Jury trial on February 12, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 2, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 26, 2001 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by July 13, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by November 14, 2001 7. File Dispositive Motions by September 12, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 22, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 29, 2002 10. Exchange Initial Disclosures by N/A 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 13, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 12, 2001 12. Discovery deadline December 14, 2001 13. Settlement Conference set for July 6, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 29, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by January 29, 2002 21. File Final witness list by January 22, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 15, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 22, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 29, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 22, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 29, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by January 29, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. ;Jury Trial set for 9:00 2/12/02 before Judge Samuel P. King , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/2/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , ; dispositive motions by 9/12/01 ; Discovery ddl 12/14/01 , ; settlement conference set for 2:00 7/6/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Sports Shinko (Waikiki) Corporation dba Sports Shinko WakikiResort Hotel's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Answer
                                                  ANSWER by defendant Sports Shinko (Waikiki) Corp. to complaint filed on January 2, 2001 [1-1]; demand trial; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed - documents served: complaint & summon personally served upon defendant Sports Shinko (Waikiki) Corporation through M. Satogato, Mgr. on 1/19/01 (lmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/9/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (fe)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?