Hutchinson, et al v. Aloha Airlines, Inco, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00003-HG-KSC
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marlene L. Hutchinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui +5236 523 523 6446 vkcarpenter1@yahoo.com
No Logo Thomas W. Hutchinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui +5236 523 523 6446 vkcarpenter1@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Aloha Airlines, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-10, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 45 U.S.C. § 151 Railway Labor Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 5/17/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV00-1-3660-12[Circuit Ct 1st Cir]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION to dismiss complaint filed on 1/2/01 with prejudice and ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor : dismissing case - on behalf of plaintiffs (fe)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference-Plaintiff's Counsel will be submitting a Stipulation for Dismissal by 05-14-2001. rule 16 conference held on 8:30 5/10/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang denying motion to remand [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - continued to 5-10-01 at 8:30 KSC. (Waiting for decision on the M/Remand heard on 3-29-01). rule 16 conference held; rule 16 conference set for 8:30 5/10/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Kevin S. Chang (fe)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
          Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inco; certificate of service (fe)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Initial Disclosure
            INITIAL DISCLOSURE by plaintiff; certificate of service (fe)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Initial Disclosure
              INITIAL DISCLOSURE by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inco; certificate of service (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiffs; certificate of service (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inco; certificate of service (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EP :Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand-Oral Argument Held. This Motion is hereby under submission to this Court. - taking under advisement on the motion to remand [4-1] ( Ct Rptr : Tape C-5) JUDGE Judge Helen (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                      REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiffs Marlene L. Hutchinson and Thomas W. Hutchinson (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO :Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand moved from 3-15-01 to 3-29-01 at 3:15 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Kevin Chang. Notified Venetia Carpenter-Asui and Roman Amaguin - setting hearing on motion to remand [4-1] 3:15 3/29/01 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Reply
                          REPLY memorandum by plaintiff re deft's memorandum in opposition to pltfs' motion to remand filed on 1/26/01 [8-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                            Submission of original declaration of Brian Tamamoto; certificate of service - by deft Aloha Airlines, Inc. (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inco in opposition to motion to remand [4-1]; declaration of Brian Tamamoto; exhibits a-d; declaration of counsel; exhibits e and f; certificate of service (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                Amended NOTICE by plaintiff of setting hearing on motion to remand [4-1] 9:30 3/15/01 before Mag Judge Kevin Chang; certificate of service (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO : Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand has been set for Monday, 3-15-01 at 9:30 KSC. Venetia Carpenter-Asui's office to notify parties. [4-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor electing to have Magistrate Judge adjudicate this motion re motion to remand [4-1] (fe)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001, Terminated: 5/1/2001 Motion to RemandCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Marlene L. Hutchinson, Thomas W. Hutchinson to remand ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibit a; certificate of service - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Answer
                                        ANSWER by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inco to [1-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/9/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 Notice of Removal
                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by defendant Aloha Airlines, Incorporated; exhibit a; certificate of service - from Circuit Ct 1st Circuit Case Number: Cv 00-1-3660-12 (fe)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?