Kalbach v. Navatek, Ltd., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00004-DAE-BMK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey Paul Kalbach, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Haseko Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay L. Friedheim +1 808 545 5454 +1 808 528 1818 jlf@pixi.com
v.
No Logo Navatek II, O.N. 999315, M/V, Defendant
No Logo Navatek, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Formby +5453 545 545 3043
No Logo Royal Hawaiian Cruises, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Formby +5453 545 545 3043
No Logo Seabird Cruises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Formby +5453 545 545 3043
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/2/2001
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 46 U.S.C. § 688 Jones Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/23/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice of all claims and all parties and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : terminating case (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Certificate Of Service.
    CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Certificate Of Service.
      Amended CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Certificate Of Service.
            CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                Withdrawal and substitution of counsel for defendants Navatek, Ltd., Seabird Cruises, Inc, Royal Hawaiian Cru; ORDER - the firm of Alcantara, Frame & Formby withdraws, firm of Frame Formby & O;kane appear (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare order. 1. Jury trial on March 5, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 23, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 16, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 3, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 5, 2001 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 3, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 12, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by February 19, 2002 10. 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 4, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 4, 2001 12. Discovery deadline January 4, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for January 3, 2002 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by December 28, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by February 19, 2002 21. File Final witness list by February 12, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 5, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 12, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by February 19, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 12, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by February 19, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by February 19, 2002 30. ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 4/9/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/5/02 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/23/02 ; Motion filing ddl set for 10/3/01 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/4/02 ; settlement conference set for 2:00 1/3/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (eps)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service by defendants Navatek, Ltd., Seabird Cruises, Inc, Royal Hawaiian Cru (eps)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT ; certificate of service - by plaintiff Jeffrey Paul Kalbach (eps)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                                  REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service by plaintiff Jeffrey Paul Kalbach (eps)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Answer
                                    ANSWER by defendant Navatek, Ltd., Seabird Cruises, Inc, Royal Hawaiian Cru to plaintiff's complaint [3-1] filed January 4, 2001; certificate of service (eps)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Seabird Cruises, Inc on 1/12/01 thru Clayton Murobayashi, president (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Amended Complaint
                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] terminating defendant Island Navigation Co; adding Royal Hawaiian Cru; jury demand; summons issued (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/9/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; (Summons(es) issued) (afc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 8/21/1991, Entered: 8/22/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE of service (eps)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?