Beach v. See's Candies, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00047-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tina L. Beach, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary A. Wilkowski +5365 536 536 5444
v.
No Logo DOE CORPORATIONS 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Sato +5236 523 523 6000 gms@ksglaw.com
No Logo Doe Individuals 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Sato +5236 523 523 6000 gms@ksglaw.com
No Logo Other Entities 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Sato +5236 523 523 6000 gms@ksglaw.com
No Logo Partnerships 1-10, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Sato +5236 523 523 6000 gms@ksglaw.com
No Logo See's Candies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory M. Sato +5236 523 523 6000 gms@ksglaw.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/17/2001
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/19/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00-1-2474-08[First Circuit]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/26/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties; ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway - plaintiff and defendant are to bear their own attorney's fees and costs - dismissing case - on behalf of defendant See's Candies, Inc. (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 31 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Settlement on the Record - Oral Motion to Seal proceedings and tape Granted. Terms stated , All hearing dates, trial dates and deadlines are Vacated. Stipulation for Dismissal is due 12/28/01. ( Ct Rptr : Tape 1739 C335) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 30 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : ;Settlement on the record set for 9:00 11/28/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 29 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting defendants See's Candies Inc.'s motion to compel plaintiff to answer deposition questions related to her application for unemployment benefits with the State of Hawaii, filed September 26, 2001 [12-1] - by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP : Further settlement conference held ; further settlement conference to be scheduled ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EO : Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages Filed 8/14/00 set for hearing on 12/3/01 @ 10:30 a.m. SOM is continued to 12/17/01 @ 10:30 a.m. SOM. Notified: Mary Wilkoswki and Gregory Sato. Ms. Wilkowski to prepare an amended notice of hearing. cc: Judge Mollway's Chambers. setting hearing on motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's complaint for damages filed August 14, 2000 [13-1] 10:30 12/17/01 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 25 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO :Further Settlement Conference set for 10:00 11/7/01 is continued to 3:00 11/15/01, LEK. Parties notified. settlement/status conference set for 3:00 11/15/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO :Further Settlement Conference set for 2:00 11/7/01 is moved up to 10:00 11/7/01, LEK. Parties notified. settlement/status conference set for 10:00 11/7/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                    Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding disovery between defendant See's Candies, Inc. and plaintiff Tina L. Beach and ORDER by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi - any party who executes this stipulated protective order may apply to the court for a modification of this order, and nothing in this order shall be deemed to prejudice any party's rights to seek modification - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP :Deft's motion to compel pltf to answer deposition questions; deft's motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii - arguments heard; motions granted; Amaguin to prepare order; information provided re unemployment application to be provided pursuant to protective order; information to be provided within 10 days of order; court makes no ruling on admissibility granting motion to compel plaintiff to answer deposition questions related to her application for unemployment benefits with the State of Hawaii [12-1], granting motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii [11-1] ( Ct Rptr : Tape 1735-C-335) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        EO : further settlement conference set for 3:00 12/13/01 is moved up to 2:00 11/7/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; parties notified ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Joinder
                          JOINDER by plaintiff's in State of Hawaii, Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, Employment Security Appeals Office's opposition to defendant See's Candies Inc.'s motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii filed September 26, 2001; certificate of service [16-1] [12-1] [11-1] (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Reply
                            REPLY memorandum in support by defendant See's Candies, Inc. of its motion to compel plaintiff to answer deposition questions related to her application for unemployment benefits with the State of Hawaii, filed 9/26/01 re [12-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Reply
                              REPLY memorandum in support by defendant See's Candies, Inc.of motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii re [11-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Description not available
                                Submission of original DECLARATION of Barbara Nashiiwa by defendant See's Candies, Inc. re [14-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiff's in opposition to defendant See's Candies Inc.'s motion to plaintiff to answer deposition questions related to her application for unemployment benefits with the State of Hawaii [12-1]; declaration of Mary A. Wilkowski; exhibit a; certificate of service (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                    State of Hawaii, Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, Employment Security Appeals Office's Opposition to Defendant See's Candies, Inc.'s Motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil Case issued to the State of Hawaii filed September 26, 2001; Exhibits A and B; Certificate of Service [11-1] (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                      CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by defendant See's Candies, Inc.; declaration of Barbara Nishiiwa; exhibits a-h; declaration of Gregory M. Sato; exhibit 1; and certificate of service [13-1] (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant See's Candies, Inc. for summary judgment on plaintiff's complaint for damages filed August 14, 2000 ; memorandum in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - set for 10:30 12/3/01 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant See's Candies, Inc. to compel plaintiff to answer deposition questions related to her application for unemployment benefits with the State of Hawaii ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits a through h; certificate of service - set for 11:00 10/29/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant See's Candies, Inc. to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii ; memorandum in support of motion to compel compliance of subpoena in a civil case issued to the State of Hawaii; declaration of counsel; exhibits a-c; certificate of service - set for 11:00 10/29/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EP : ;Settlement conference held 9/20/01 ; further settlement conference to be scheduled ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. 1. Jury trial on March 12, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 29, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 22, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 10, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 12, 2001 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 10, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 19, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by February 26, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 10, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 10, 2001 12. Discovery deadline January 11, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for September 20, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by September 13, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by February 26, 2002 21. File Final witness list by February 19, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 12, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 19, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by February 26, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 19, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by February 26, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by February 26, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. Judge Susan Oki Mollway's Trial Procedures given to parties. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 4/24/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/12/02 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/29/02 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/11/02 ; Motion filing ddl set for 10/10/01 ; settlement conference set for 2:00 9/20/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      EO : rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 4/23/01 is continued to 9:00 4/24/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Mary Wilkowski to notify Gregory M. Sato ( Ct Rptr : ) Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant See's Candies, Inc.'s; and certificate of service (lmg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Answer
                                                            ANSWER by defendant See's Candies, Inc. to plaintiff's complaint filed on August 14, 2000 [1-1]; and certificate of service (lmg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra setting rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 4/23/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                                Defendant See's Candies, Inc.'s NOTICE OF REMOVAL of civil action from state to federal court; exhibit a; and certificate of service - from First Circuit Case Number: 00-1-2474-8 (lmg)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?