Santiago v. California Associati
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00054-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard Santiago, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo California Association for Research in Astronomy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 1/19/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hawaii
Terminated 7/21/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 47 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT:that Summary Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment" filed on July 17, 2003; the Court finds that Defendant is entitled to summary judgment and the Court grants the defendant's motion. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied [46-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 46 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003, Terminated: 7/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by Judge Edward F. Shea [37-1], [36-1] (cc: all counsel) - the district court executive is directed to 1) enter this order; 2) enter judgment accordingly; 3) provide copies to counsel (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 45 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment-Oral Argument Held. This Motion is hereby Denied. Defendant California Association for Research in Astronomy's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Filed October 3, 2002-Oral Argument Held. This Motion is hereby Granted. Court to prepare the Order. [37-1] [36-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Edward F. Shea (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 44 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant California Associati in response to its motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's amended complaint filed October 3, 2002 [37-1], [36-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibit r; certificate of copliance; certificate of service (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 43 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Richard Santiago in support of opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment dated April 22, 2003 [42-1], [37-1] (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 42 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Notice of hearing; plaintiff Richard Santiago's OPPOSITION to defendants motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's amended complaint filed [37-1] April 22, 2003; memorandum in support of opposition; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 41 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by defendant California Associati in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment on defendants answer to plaintiffs amended complaint filed October 24, 2002 and affirmative defenses therein [36-1] filed April 22, 2003; certificate of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EO : Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant California Association for Research in Astronomy's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Filed October 3, 2002. These motions set for 07/14/2003 @10:30amDAE will be heard before visiting Judge Edward F. Shea. This case will remain assigned to Judge Ezra. [37-1] [36-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Edward F. Shea (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EP : Settlement Conference. Settlement conference held. Settlement on call ( Ct Rptr : C5 no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                    SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by defendant California Associati in support of motion for summary judgment on plaintiff's amended complaint filed October 3, 2002 [37-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits a through d; and 1; declaration of Sheila Sumaylo; exhibits e through q; declaration of Dennis McBride; declaration of Ron Laub; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 7/14/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant California Associati for summary judgment on plaintiff's amended complaint filed October 3, 2002 ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; certificate of service - set for 10:30 7/14/03 before Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 7/14/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Richard Santiago for summary judgment on defendants answer to plaintiffs amended complaint filed October 24, 2002 and affirmative defenses therein ; certificate of service - set for 10:30 7/14/03 before Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Initial Disclosure
                          AMENDED INITIAL DISCLOSURE; certificate of service - by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Initial Disclosure
                            INITIAL DISCLOSURE; certificate of service by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Initial Disclosure
                              INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service by defendant California Associati (eps)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Description not available
                                DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT EVIDENCE; certificate of service by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant California Associati (eps)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant California Associati (fe)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/24/2002 Answer
                                      ANSWER by defendant California Associati to amended complaint [26-1] to motion to amend pleadingsin complaint form filed filed January 19, 2001 filed August 9, 2002, dated October 1, 2002; certificate of service (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang denying plaintiff Richard Santiago's motion for first stipulation extending time [20-1]; dated September 4, 2002 - on behalf of deft (eps)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang granting plaintiff's motion to amend pleadings in complaint form filed January 19, 2001 [17-1]; filed August 9, 2002 - on behalf of deft (eps)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Amended Complaint
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT to motion to amend pleadings in complaint form filed filed January 19, 2001 filed August 9, 2002 [1-1]; certificate of service - by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                              Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                EP : Motion to Amend Pleadings in Complaint filed January 19, 2001 - granted. Amended Complaint to be filed by 10-7-02. Amaguin to prepare order. Plaintiff Richard Santiago's Motion for First Stipulation Extending Time - denied without prejudice. Roman Amaguin to prepare order. Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order: 1. Jury trial on September 23, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on August 12, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by August 5, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by CLOSED 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by June 25, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by April 23, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by September 2, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by September 9, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 24, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 23, 2003 12. Discovery deadline July 25, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for May 20, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by May 13, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by September 9, 2003 21. File Final witness list by September 2, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by August 26, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by September 2, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by September 9, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by September 2, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by September 9, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by September 9, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: [17-1] [20-1] ; Trial held 9/24/02 ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 9/23/03 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 8/12/03 ; Motion filing ddl set for 4/23/03 ; Discovery ddl set for 7/25/03 ; settlement conference set for 2:00 5/20/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : Tape C5 935) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on motion for first stipulation extending time [20-1] 9:45 9/24/02 KSC (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATION to lift stay of proceedings, filed May 22, 2001 and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : [12-2] CASE STAY lifted (eps)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                      MEMORANDUM by defendant California Associati in opposition to plaintiff's motion to amend pleadings in complaint form filed January 19, 2001 [17-1]; filed August 9, 2002; declaration of counsel; certificate of service (eps)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002, Terminated: 9/24/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                        PRO SE MOTION and motion by plaintiff Richard Santiago for first stipulation extending time referred to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 Notice of Hearing.
                                                          NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on motion to amend pleadings in complaint form filed January 19, 2001 [17-1] 9:45 9/24/02 (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            AMENDED CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002, Terminated: 9/24/2002 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                              MOTION and motion by plaintiff Richard Santiago to amend pleadings in complaint form filed January 19, 2001 ; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: 7/30/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  EP :Status Conference - Re dates Rule 16 Scheduling Order: 1. Non-jury trial on March 11, 2003 at 9:00.a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 28, 2003 at 9:00a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 21, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 9, 2002 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 11, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 9, 2002 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 18, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by February 25, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 9, 2002 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 9, 2002 12. Discovery deadline January 10, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for November 4, 2002 at 3:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by October 28, 2002 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by February 18, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 11, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 18, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by February 25, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 18, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by February 25, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by February 25, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by February 25, 2003 Other Matters: status conference held 7/23/02 , ; Trial set for 9:00 3/11/03 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/28/03 ; Motion filing set for 10/9/02 ; Discovery ddl set for 1/10/03 ; settlement/status conference set for 3:00 11/4/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    EO : Status Conference Re: Dates set for 07/23/2002 08:30:00 AM KSC. Notified Richard Santiago and Richard Rand ( Ct Rptr : Tap) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION for stay of proceedings by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : proceeding is stayed pending the outcome of the administrative appeal pending in the 3rd Circuit Court, State of Hawaii CASE STAYED on behalf of deft (cc: CRD to DAE,KSC) (eps) Modified on 05/22/2001
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff Richard Santiago (eps)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant California Associati; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            EP: Order to Show Cause/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference-Plaintiff Pro Se was present. Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 05-24-2001 @8:30 a.m. The Plaintiff will participate by Phone. The Court will place a call to Mr. Santiago at (808) 889-5692. The Court inquired of the Plaintiff of a residence phone number. The Plaintiff stated this telephone number for the record-(808) 345-1065. [9-1] rule 16 conference set for 8:30 5/24/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (Ct Rptr : Tape-C5) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001, Terminated: 5/10/2001 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: failure to appear at the scheduling conference by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) set for 9:00 5/10/01 to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/23/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                EO : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - no one present. As to plaintiff Richard Santiago: Order to Show Cause for failure to attend the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4-23-01 at 9:00 am. before Magistrate Judge Kevin Chang and for failure to prosecute ordered. Return date: Thursday, 5-10-01 at 9:30 KSC ; rule 16 conference before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                  ANSWER on behalf of defendant California Associati [1-1]; certificate of service (eps)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant California Associati thru Fred Chafee on 3/21/01 by DUSM Brent Naluai (eps)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis and denying plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel - by Judge David A. Ezra [3-1] [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 RequestCourt Filing
                                                                                        REQUEST by plaintiff for appointment of counsel under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 USC 2000e-5(f)(1)(B); declaration in support of request - referred to Judge David Ezra (fe)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/26/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                          APPLICATION by plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/23/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Complaint
                                                                                              Employment discrimination COMPLAINT; right to sue letter; summons issued (fe)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 67 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?