Kingman Reef Atoll, et al v. Dept of Interior, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00122-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kingman Reef Atoll Development, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Tom Quitiquit Chee & Watts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian P. Porter +5263 526 526 3011 +5231 523 523 1171 cporter@btpqlaw.com
No Logo Kingman Reef Atoll Investments, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Tom Quitiquit Chee & Watts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian P. Porter +5263 526 526 3011 +5231 523 523 1171 cporter@btpqlaw.com
No Logo Kingman Reef Enterprises, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyle S. Hosoda & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lyle S. Hosoda lsh@hosodalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Tom Quitiquit Chee & Watts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian P. Porter +5263 526 526 3011 +5231 523 523 1171 cporter@btpqlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Short Cressman & Burgess PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. DuBey +1 206 682 3333
Space Michael R. Garner +1 206 682 3333
No Logo Palmyra Pacific Seafoods, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyle S. Hosoda & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lyle S. Hosoda lsh@hosodalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter Tom Quitiquit Chee & Watts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian P. Porter +5263 526 526 3011 +5231 523 523 1171 cporter@btpqlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Short Cressman & Burgess PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. DuBey +1 206 682 3333
Space Michael R. Garner +1 206 682 3333
v.
No Logo Department of Interior, United States, The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven S. Alm +5412 541 541 2850
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Fish & Wildlife, United States, The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven S. Alm +5412 541 541 2850
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850
No Logo Marshall Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven S. Alm +5412 541 541 2850
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850
No Logo The Honorable Gale Norton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven S. Alm +5412 541 541 2850
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850
Office Hawaii
Filed 2/16/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 3/27/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002 Transcript
TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Debra Kekuna Chun) taken on 03/18/02 (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002 Judgment*
    Civil JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered pursuant to the "order granting defendants' motion to dismiss and denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment" filed on March 22, 2002; it is further ordered that pursuant to said order, defendants' alternative motion for summary judgment is denied, and plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied as moot - by WALTER A.Y.H. CHINN, CLERK/Laila M. Geronimo, Deputy Clerk - terminating case (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 47 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting defendants' motion to dismiss and denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment by Judge Susan O. Mollway - denying motion for summary judgment [24-1], granting motion to dismiss [19-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg) Modified on 03/19/2003
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP :Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment - Arguments. Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment - taken under advisement. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment - taken under advisement. Court to issue a written ruling this week. taking under advisement on the motion for summary judgment [24-1], taking under advisement on the motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment [19-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO :Continued ; final pretrial conference from 04/09/02 9:00 AM to 9:00 AM 4/16/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi cc: all counsel ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Affidavit
            Original AFFIDAVIT of Frank Sorba in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment; certificate of service [19-1] (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Joinder
              JOIN Reply brief by plaintiffs' to defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 42 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by defendants' to plaintiffs' joint memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, or for summary judgment, filed February 28, 2002; certificate of service [40-1] [19-1] (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                  JUDGE'S DISCLOSURE - by courtroom deputy, Toni Fujinaga (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 40 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Joint MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs' in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1] (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                        Concise STATEMENT of facts by plaintiffs' in support of opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1] (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 37 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Affidavit
                          AFFIDAVIT of Christian P. Porter in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1]; exhibit a (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 36 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Affidavit
                            AFFIDAVIT of Dudley Fullard-Leo in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1] (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT of Anisley Fullared-Leo in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1] (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 34 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Affidavit
                                AFFIDAVIT of Peter Savio in support of plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment filed December 18, 2001 [19-1] (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM by defendants' in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                    RESPONSE by defendants' to plaintiffs' concise statement of material facts [25-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      EP : ;settlement conference held; further settlement conference set for 2:00 4/23/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi cc: all counsel ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION to rescheduule hearing date on motions for summary judgment; ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway - setting hearing on motion for summary judgment [24-1] 9:00 3/18/02 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EO :Continued : [Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Altrnative, for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment] from 03/11/2002 09:00:00 AM to 03/18/2002 09:00:00 AM Mr. Helper to prepare a stipulation to continue. hearing on motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment [19-1] 9:00 3/18/02 ( Ct Rptr : DC) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                            Amended CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Description not available
                                                DECLARATION by plaintiffs' of John J. Houlihan, Jr. in suport of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [24-1] (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                  CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by plaintiffs' in support of plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [24-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002, Terminated: 3/22/2002 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff' for summary judgment ; memorandum in support; and certificate of service - set for 9:00 3/11/02 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                      Plaintiffs' JOINT EX PARTE MOTION for permission to file over length brief in support of motion for summary judgment; ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway - granting ex parte motion; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                        EO :Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment set for 1/30/02 @ 9:45 a.m. SOM is continued to 3/11/02 @ 9:00 a.m. SOM. Notified: Chris Porter and Thomas Helper thru Mr. Porter. Mr. Porter to prepare an amended notice of hearing - setting hearing on motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment [19-1] 9:00 3/11/02 SOM ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Description not available
                                                          DECLARATION of Christian P. Porter in support of plaintiffs' joint ex parte motion for permission to file over length brief in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [19-1] - by plaintiffs (lmg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                            CONCISE STATEMENT of material facts by federal defendants' in support of federal defendants' motion to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment [19-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by federal defendants' to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment ; table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of federal defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for summary judgment; declaration of Catherine Sheppard; exhibits a-q; certificate of service - set for 9:45 1/30/02 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                EO: Settlement Conference set for 9:00 12/13/01 is continued to 2:00 2/12/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Christian P. Porter to notify all parties () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    EP : Status Conference Re: Trial Date and Deadlines held. New dates given. 1. Non-jury trial on May 21, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on April 9, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 2, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 20, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 20, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 19, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 30, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 7, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 19, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 19, 2001 12. Discovery deadline March 22, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for Decmber 13, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by December 6, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by April 30, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 23, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 30, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 7, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 30, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 7, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by May 7, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by May 7, 2002 Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. Judge Susan Oki Mollway's Trial Procedures given to parties. A copy of the Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. ;Non-jury trial set for 9:00 5/21/02 before Judge Susan O. Mollway , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 4/9/02 settlement conference set for 2:00 12/13/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , ;dispositive motions by 12/19/01 ; Discovery ddl set for 3/22/02 ( Ct Rptr No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of hearing ;settlement conference set for 2:00 10/26/01 is continued to 2:00 10/30/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; also: confidential settlement conf stmts will now be due on 10/23/01 (cc: all counsel of record) (lmg)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to appear pro hac vice; affidavit of Richard A. DuBey; affidavit of John J. Houlihan, Jr.; exhibit a; ORDER - by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi - granting ex parte application to appear pro hac vice for attorney Richard A. Dubey - by plaintiffs (lmg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. 1. Non-jury trial on March 19, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on February 5, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by January 29, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by August 20, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by December 19, 2001 7. File Dispositive Motions by October 17, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by February 26, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by March 5, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 17, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by October 17, 2001 12. Discovery deadline January 18, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for October 26, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by October 19, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by February 26, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by February 19, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by February 26, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by March 5, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by February 26, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by March 5, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by March 5, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by March 5, 2002 Other Matters: Status Conference set for 9:00 7/27/01, LEK. LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. Judge Susan Oki Mollway's Trial Procedures given to parties. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. [rule 16 conference held on 9:00 5/21/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Non-Jury Trial set for 9:00 3/19/02 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway ; final pretrial set for 9:00 2/5/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi , Discovery ddl set for 1/18/02; Motion filing ddl set 10/17/01; settlement conference set for 2:00 10/26/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi] (Ct Rptr: No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Transmittal of Documents
                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD for the establishment of Kingman Reef National Wildlife Refuge; certificate of service re: file 3 of 3, exhibit no. 80-118 - by deft USA (lmg)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Transmittal of Documents
                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD for the establishment of Kingman Reef National Wildlife Refuge; certificate of service re: file 2 of 3, exhibt no. 51-79 - by deft USA (lmg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Transmittal of Documents
                                                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD for the establishment of Kingman Reef National Wildlife Refuge; certificate of service re file 1 of 3, exhibit no. 1-50 - by deft USA (lmg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendants; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiffs Kingman Reef Atoll Investment, L.L.C.'s, Kingman Reef Atoll Development, L.L.C.'s, Reef Atoll Enterprises, L.L.C.'s and Palmyra Pacific Seafoods, L.L.C.'s; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                        REPORT OF MEETING OF PARTIES by plaintiffs pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(f) and LR 26.1; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          Notice of APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL for plaintiffs Kingman Reef Enterprises, L.L.C., a Washington limited liability company and Palmyra Pacific Seafoods, L.L.C., a Washington limited liability company; certificate of service - attorney appearance by Lyle S. Hosoda, Michael Garner, Christian P. Porter (lmg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Answer
                                                                                            ANSWER by defendants to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                              Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingman Reef Attol Investments, L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant Steven S. Alam, United States District Attorney for the District of Hawaii; exhibts a-l; certificate of service - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Steven S. Alm, United States District Attorney for the District of Hawaii received by (signature illegible) on 2/26/01) (lmg)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingman Reef Atoll Investments, L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant The Honorable John Ashcroft, United States Attorney General - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon John Ashcroft, US Attorney received by Ernest (middled initials illegible) Parker on 2/23/01 (lmg)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                  Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingsman Reef Atoll Investments, L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant Marshall Jones in his official capacity as Director of Fish & Wildlife Service - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Marshall Jones received by Annie Brown on 2/23/01) (lmg)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                    Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingman Reef Atoll Investments, L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant The United States Fish & Wildlife - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Fish & Wildlife received by Annie Brown on 2/23/01) (lmg)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                      Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingman Reef Atoll Investments L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant The Honorable Gale Norton, in her official capacity as secretary of the interior - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Gale Norton received by Joy Van Duyne on 2/23/01) (lmg)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                        Affidavit of plaintiffs Kingman Reef Atoll Invesments, L.L.C.'s and Kingman Reef Development, L.L.C.'s counsel re service by registered mail on defendant Dept of Interior, United States; exhibit a-l; certificate of service - (RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Dept of Interior on 2/23/01 - receipt for registered mail from plaintiffs atty) (lmg) Modified on 04/30/2001
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 5/21/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief; summons (issued) (lmg)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?