Ramos, et al v. United States of Ame, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00221-SOM-LEK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Franie Ramos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
No Logo Ponciano S. Mencias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence I. Kawasaki +5337 533 533 7434 seitzoffice@yahoo.com
Space Eric A. Seitz +5337 533 533 7434 eseitzatty@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo DEA Agents, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/4/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/26/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice; ORDER by Judge Susan Oki Mollway - by defts terminating case (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION for compromise settlement and release of Federal Tort Claims Act Claims pursuant to 28 USC 2677 and ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway : on behalf of pltf USA (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : Parties to submit the stipulation for dismissal by 1/15/02. cc: Eric Seitz, Thomas Helper AUSA. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (fe)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO: Settlement Conference set for 10:00 10/26/01, LEK is vacated. Case settled. Per counsel, settlement on the record not necessary, settlement documents being drafted and will be submitted for Judge Susan Oki Mollway's consideration shortly. () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO: Settlement Conference set for 2:00 12/19/01 is moved up to 10:00 10/26/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi. Confidential Settlement Conference statements will be submitted as soon as possible. () JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/28/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: all counsel) (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/28/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Robert Morean is leaving Thomas A. Helper will be taking over this case. 1. Jury trial on May 21, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on April 9, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before LEK 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by April 2, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by October 19, 2001 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 20, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 19, 2001 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 30, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by May 7, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 19, 2001 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 19, 2001 12. Discovery deadline March 22, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for December 19, 2001 at 2:00 p.m. before LEK 14. Settlement Conference statements by December 12, 2001 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by May 7, 2002 21. File Final witness list by April 30, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 23, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 30, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by May 7, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 30, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by May 7, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by May 7, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A Other Matters: LR 56.1 Memorandum given to parties. Judge Susan Oki Mollway's Trial Procedures given to parties. A copy of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order mailed to all parties. [rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 7/25/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 5/21/02 before Judge Susan Oki Mollway ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 4/9/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Motion filing ddl set for 12/19/01; Discovery ddl set for 3/22/02; settlement conference set for 2:00 12/19/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi] (Ct Rptr: No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/28/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendants (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Answer
                  ANSWER to complaint; certificate of service - by defendant United States of America, defendant DEA Agents [1-1] (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                    REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service - by plaintiffs (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiffs (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                        RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant United States of America thru service at the Office of U.S. Attorney, 300 Ala Moana Blvd, service acknowledged by Stephen Lehto, on 5/15/01 (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                          RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant "Eight unknown named Agents of the Drug Enforcement Administration" thru agent Gerald Lawson on 5/15/01 (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                            NOTICE of hearing rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/23/01 contd to 9:00 7/25/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (cc: Eric Seitz) (eps)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/23/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT for damages; demand for jury trial; summons (Summons(es) issued) (afc)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?