Helicopter Consultan v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00256-DAE-BMK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Helicopter Consultants Of Maui, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig K. Hirai +5236 523 523 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald I. Heller +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 rheller@torkildson.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Morean +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M Duffy , +1 202 307 6406 +1 202 307 0054 Charles.M.Duffy@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/20/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $127000
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maui
Terminated 4/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal without prejudice; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra - filed by USA terminating case (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO: EO: Parties close to settlement per Carl from Ronald Heller's office. Status Conference re Dismissal set for 04/29/2002 09:00 AM, BMK. All other dates vacated. Carl to notify parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference- Court set a Discovery Cut Off Date of January 31, 2002. Status/Settlement Conference set for March 25, 2002 @9:00 a.m. before Judge Kurren. No other Dates as to Scheduling were set.; [Discovery ddl set for 1/31/02; settlement/status conference set for 9:00 3/25/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren] (Ct Rptr: No Record-In Chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 Initial Disclosure
            INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Answer
              ANSWER by defendant United States of America to complaint; certificate of service [1-1] (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EP: Rule 16 Scheduling conference cont to 9:00 10/9/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; parties working on settlement (Ct Rptr: Chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) Modified on 09/10/2001
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/19/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                  SECOND STIPULATION extending time to respond to complaint by 30 days; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra : extending USA time to answer to on or before 09-17-01 - filed by USA (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EP: rule 16 scheduling conference cont to 9:00 9/4/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (Ct Rptr: No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendant (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Report of Planning Meeting
                        REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service by plaintiff (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Scheduling Conference Statement
                          RULE 16 STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/24/2001 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                            FIRST STIPULATION extending time to respond to complaint by 53 days ; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra -[USA has until 08/17/01 to serve a response to the complaint] by USA adding attorney Robert P. Morean, Charles M. Duffy (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 7/30/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT for refund of Internal Revenue Taxer; exhibits a-b; demand for jury trial; summons (Summons(es) issued) (afc)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 91 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?