Au v. Aloha Airlines Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00279-SOM-KSC
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thomas T. Au, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G. Mueller +1 202 273 1042 daniel.mueller@nlrb.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 4/27/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 740 - Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Hawaii
Terminated 7/12/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: denying Plaintiff's motion to vacate and set aside arbitration award [9-1], [10-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Description not available
    DECLARATION of Albert J. Pattison supporting respondent's memorandum in opposition to motion to vacate and set aside arbitration award filed May 25, 2001; exhibits a-b; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc re [3-1] (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      Amended ORDER denying motion to vacate arbitration award by Judge Susan O. Mollway re [9-1] (cc: all counsel) (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001, Terminated: 6/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway denying motion to vacate arbitration award [3-1] - arbitrator to submit arbitration award w/ court as required by the RLA; clerk is directed to close this case (cc: all counsel, Charles Bocken) (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP : Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Arbitration Award - Discussion held re: the arbitration process. Mr. Mueller to submit a declaration re: 2 letters submitted to the Court. Arguments. Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Arbitration Award - Denied. Court will prepare the order [3-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Answer
            ANSWER by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc to complaint [1-1] filed on April 27, 2001; certificate of service (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by defendant Aloha Airlines Inc in opposition to motion to vacate and set aside arbitration award [3-1]; declaration of Daniel G. Mueller; exhibit a; and certificate of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Aloha Airlines Inc on 5/11/01 by leaving copies with Denise Davis, customer service agent for Aloha Airlines ticket counter, Kona International Airport, Kailua-Kona, HI 96740 (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO :Petitioner's Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Arbitration Award is set for hearing on 6/12/01 @ 10:30 a.m. SOM. cc: Thomas Au, Judge Mollway's Chambers. Mr. Au to serve defendant setting; [1-1]; [3-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001, Terminated: 6/14/2001 Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Thomas T. Au to vacate and set aside arbitration award referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 8/6/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT by Petitioner Thomas T. Au's; notice of hearing of complaint and motion; motion to vacate and set aside arbitration award; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Thomas T. Au; exhibits a,b; certificate of service; summons (issued) (lmg)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 96 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?