Caballero v. Social Security, Com
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00377-ACK-LEK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pancho A. Caballero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by sisna.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur E. Ross +5214 521 521 4343 3artross@sisna.com
v.
No Logo Social Security, Commissioner of, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 6/7/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 863 - D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W. (US Defendant)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Honolulu
Terminated 5/22/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags REMAND, TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Transmittal of Documents
TRANSMITTAL of documents: certified copy of case docket and complaint [1-1], and stipulation [11-1] and entire case case file mailed to Social Security Administration, Office of Hearings and Appeals - (letter cc'd to all counsel) (fe)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay : remanding case for further administrative proceeding and for dismissal without prejudice re [10-1] dismissing case (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Further status conference/re-setting conference re; breifing schedule - stipulation for dismissal without prejudice and for remand to be submitted to Judge Alan C. Kay settlement/status conference held 5/20/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : In Chamber-No REcord) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP : Status Conference Re: Briefing Schedule held. All deadlines Vacated. Status Conference/Re-Setting Conference Re: Briefing Deadlines set for 9:30 5/20/02, LEK. ; status conference set for 9:30 5/20/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : In Chamber-No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 4/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : ;status conference re: briefing schedule set for 9:30 4/2/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; Arthur Ross to notify Thomas Helper () Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (sealed)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Answer
            ANSWER by defendant to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
              TRANSCRIPT of administrative record, dated February 8, 2002 - by defendant Social Security, Com (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                EP :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - AUSA Michael Chun indicated that the above entitled action will be assigned to AUSA Thomas Helper. Deadlines discussed. Defendant's Answer and Administrative Record due 2/15/02. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due 3/22/02. Defendant's Responsive Brief due 5/17/02. Plaintiff's Optional Reply Brief due 6/7/02. The Case will be either be deemed under submission to Judge Alan C. Kay as of 6/7/02 or may be set for Oral Argument by Judge Alan C. Kay. cc: E. Dorothy Miwa, Courtroom Deputy to Judge Alan C. Kay (via E-Mail) ;rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 10/22/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : No JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed: documents served complaint and summons - upon the office of US Attorney thru Dean Yanohira, paralegal specialist on 10/19/01 (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EP :Rule 16 scheduling conference not held; service needs to be completed; rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 10/22/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : No record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 9/17/01 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT; summons (issued) (lmg)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 72 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?