Connell v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00505-DAE-BMK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Connell, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 8/2/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 10/29/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases CA#03-15127[], {}
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT-9TH CCA affirming the decision of the District Court [47-1] (gs)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Filing Fee Received
    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 105.00, receipt # 215414 (gs)
      LREF
      Blank 53 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
        LREF
        Blank 52 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Designation of Record on Appeal
        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form - none designated re [47-1] (gs)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Appeal - Miscellaneous
          NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number CA #03-15127 (fe)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [47-1] (gs)
              LREF
              Blank 51 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Michael Connell (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 50 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Description not available
                DECLARATION by plaintiff Michael Connell of in forma pauperis status re [47-1] (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 49 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Designation of Record on Appeal
                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: none ordered re [47-1] (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 48 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Remark
                    Certificate of issues on appeal (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 47 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Michael Connell from Dist. Court decision [46-2] (cc: all counsel) - CA #03-15127 (fe) Modified on 01/29/2003
                        LREF
                        Blank 46 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Judgment*Court Filing
                        JUDGMENT in a Civil Case: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is Dismissed pursuant to the "Order Granting Government's Motion to Dismiss of for Summary Judgment; Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment" by Judge Ezra, filed on October 28, 2002 terminating case (gs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER Granting Government's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge David A. Ezra [17-1], [31-1] (gs)
                            LREF
                            Blank 44 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER Affirming The Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Judge David A. Ezra [41-1] (gs)
                              LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 42 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (afc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002, Terminated: 10/28/2002 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District CoCourt Filing
                                  APPEAL FROM MAGISTRATE'S ORDER denying appointment of counsel [35-1] by plaintiff Michael Connell - referred to Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Description not available
                                      DECLARATION in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment re [31-1] (gs)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EO: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, filed 9/30/02, is set for hearing on 12/12/02 2:00 p.m. before Judge Kurren [33-1] Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion Requesting Authorization from the Court for Escorted Transportation to and from Court Hearing by Judge David A. Ezra [29-1] (gs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                            Letter: Request for Calendering of Motions & Order by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Deyning Motion for Reconsideration by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren [26-1] (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by plaintiff Michael Connell to compel Discovery before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                  EO: Deft's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Deft's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment-SET for 10/7/02 @ 9:45 a.m. DAE will be decided on the papers without a hearing; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment - To be decided on the papers without a hearing; cc: all parties re [31-1] Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    Certification of Plaintiff in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery by plaintiff Michael Connell [33-1] (gs)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by plaintiff Michael Connell for summary judgment before Judge David A. Ezra non-hearing motion (gs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002, Terminated: 10/2/2002 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                          EX PARTE MOTION Requesting Authorization from the Court for escorted transportation to and from court hearing by plaintiff Michael Connell before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (afc)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [17-1] (afc)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                Motion for Recincideration of Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel by plaintiff Michael Connell for reconsideration before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs) Modified on 09/26/2002
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (gs)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (gs)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (gs)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren [20-1] (gs)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Exhibit
                                                                          Supplemental EXHIBITS in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel on behalf of plaintiff Michael Connell [20-1] (gs)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002, Terminated: 8/9/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                            Motion by plaintiff Michael Connell for appointment of counsel referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              Amended CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (eps)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                Request for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Michael Connell against the Defendant USA (gs) Modified on 07/22/2002
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002, Terminated: 10/28/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION; Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment of Defendant United States; Memorandum in support of motion to dismiss or for summary judgment of Defendant United States of America; Declaration of Erlinda Lowry; Exhibits A - D; Certificate of Service to dismiss set for 9:45 10/7/02 before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EP: Rule 16 Scheduling conference - pltf not available by phone; Helper indicated to court that he would be filing a M/Dismiss within 2 weeks Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Description not available
                                                                                      DECLARATION by plaintiff Michael Connell (gs)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of the United States of America; Certificate of Service by defendant United States of Ame (gs)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          EO: continued: [Rule 16 Scheduling conference] from 4/29/02 9:00 a.m. to 6/10/02 9:00 a.m. before BMK at the request of plaintiff Michael Connell; Connell in transit to FDC Hawaii; cc: Michael Chun, Rosanne Donohoe Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            EO: Continued: Rule 16 Scheduling conference from 2/11/02 9:00 a.m. to 4/29/02 9:00 a.m. before Judge Barry Kurren; Any party who would like to participate by phone is to notify Richlyn Young at (808) 541-3090 prior to 4/29/02; Mr. Connell to notify parties of this dae; cc: Michael Connell Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                              PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon Rosanne T. Donohoe, U.S. Probation Officer on 1/16/02 (afc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                Process Receipt and Return (gs)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                  Process Receipt and Return (gs)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Summons Issued
                                                                                                    SUMMONS issued (fe)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Michael Connell in support of Application to proceed in forma pauperis re [3-1] (gs)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER Denying without prejudice plaintiff's Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis by Judge David A. Ezra [3-1] (gs)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                            Plaintiff's RESPONSE to the Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by plaintiff Michael Connell to [2-2] (gs)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001, Terminated: 9/5/2001 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                              APPLICATION by plaintiff Michael Connell to proceed in forma pauperis referred to Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 2/11/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief pursuant to the declaratory judgment Act Title 28 USCA 2201 & 2202 (fe)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 60 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?