Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to Publications
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt of Acknowledgment Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Ex Parte Quayle Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Ex Parte Quayle Action (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Quayle action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Referred by L&R for Third-Level Security Review. Agency Referral Letter Generated
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Now Complete
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |