Miller v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00580-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexandra Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by sherrybroder.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherry P. Broder +5311 531 531 1411 +5318 531 531 8411 sherrybroder@sherrybroder.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 8/31/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/9/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - submitted by deft USA terminating case (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO : Case settled per Thomas Helper Status Conference Re Dismissal set for 12/20/2002 09:00:00 AM, BMK. All other dates vacated. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : settlement conference set for 10:00 9/20/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Confidential Statements due 9/18/02. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : settlement conference set for 9/13/02 vacated at the agreement of all parties Awaiting IME report. Helper to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : Final Pretrial Conference not held. At the request of both parties, new dates given. Court to prepare an amended scheduling order. 1. Non-jury trial on February 4, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on December 19, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 12, 2002 5. 6. 7. 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 14, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 21, 2003 11a. 11b. 12. Discovery deadline December 6, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for September 13, 2002 at 11:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by September 12, 2002 20. 21. File Final witness list by January 14, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 7, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 14, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 21, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 14, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 21, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by January 21, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by January 21, 2003 ; Trial set for 9:00 2/4/03 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; Discovery ddl set for 12/6/02 , ; Pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/19/02 ; settlement/status conference set for 11:00 9/13/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : Chambers) JUDGE Mag Barry M. Kurren (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002 Final Pretrial Conference Report
              Final Pretrial Statement of Defendant United States; certificate of service (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 19 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                Final Pretrial STATEMENT by plaintiff Alexandra Miller; certificate of service (gab)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO : settlement conference continued from 7/30/02 2:00 p.m. to 11:00 9/13/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Thomas Helper to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : settlement conference moved from 7/31/02 10:00 a.m. to 2:00 7/30/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (gab)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Alexandra Miller (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Description not available
                          DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plaintiff Alexandra Miller certificate of service (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Description not available
                            DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plaintiff Alexandra Miller certificate of service (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE of service (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant United States of Ame (gab)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EP : Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Non-jury trial on October 16, 2002 at 9:00.a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on September 4, 2002 at 9:00a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by August 28, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 15, 2002 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by July 17, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by May 15, 2002 8a. File Motions in Limine by September 24, 2002 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by October 1, 2002 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 15, 2002 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by May 15, 2002 12. Discovery deadline August 19, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for May 23, 2002 at 10:00 a.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by May 20, 2002 20. 21. File Final witness list by September 24, 2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by September 17, 2002 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by September 24, 2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by October 1, 2002 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by September 24, 2002 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by October 1, 2002 29. File Trial Brief by October 1, 2002 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by October 1, 2002 ( Ct Rptr : Chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Alexandra Miller; certificate of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EO : rule 16 conference cont. from 1/8/02 to 9:00 1/23/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Sherry Broder to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant United States of America; certificate of service (gab)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Answer
                                            ANSWER by defendant United States of America to complaint; certificate of service [1-1] (afc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Service - Miscellaneous
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint and summons executed upon defendant United States of America on 9/21/01 by leaving copies with Steven Lehto (afc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference continued from 12-10-01 to 1-8-02 @ 9 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Scheduling Conference Statement due 1-4-02. cc: Sherry Broder, Thomas Helper () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/10/01 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (tbf)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT; summons (Summons(es) issued) (tbf)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Remark
                                                      FILING FEE PAID - 203918 - $150.00 (tbf)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?