Pasion v. Jan, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00631-SOM-BMK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Juliette Pasion, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman, Bruce F.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce F. Sherman bfs@bfshermanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Jan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by lawcsilc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lum +5225 522 522 5133 ksagena@lawcsilc.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/24/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Kauai
Terminated 6/13/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002 Notice of Dismissal
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION with prejudice as to all claims and parties - by plaintiff Juliette Pasion (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 06/10/2002 09:00:00 AM to 06/24/2002 09:00:00 AM, BMK. Parties working on settlement. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO :Rule 16 scheduling conference from 05/07/02 9:00 AM to 06/10/02 9:00 AM, BMK; Sherman to notify parties; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 6/10/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 04/12/2002 09:00:00 AM to 05/07/2002 09:00:00 AM, BMK. Per Sherman close to settlement. Sherman to notify parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for Tuesday, February 26, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. before the Honorable Barry M. Kurren, continued to Friday, April 12, 2002 at 9:00 a.m. Bruce Sherman to notify parties () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Jan, Inc. through service upon Janet A. Sueoka on 10/1/01 (note: return of service form language: "Service of the First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint...") (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Certificate Of Service.
              CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : rule 16 conference moved from 1/7/02 to for 9:00 2/26/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Bruce Sherman to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/7/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 47 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?