A Plus Travel v. Kato, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00662-ACK-LEK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A Plus Travel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelita Green +1 808 742 9541
v.
No Logo ET AL, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Post Office-Koloa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/9/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Hawaii
Terminated 1/2/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case SC-KO-01-39[Fifth Circuit]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal without prejudice; ORDER by Judge Alan C. Kay - each party to bear its own costs terminating case - on behalf of defendant USA (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Transmittal of Documents
    TRANSMITTAL of documents from Small Claims Division of the District Court of the Fifth Circuit, Koloa Division, State of Hawaii - original record, together with the index to the record to Civil Case No. SC-KO-01-39 (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant United States of Ame to dismiss ; memorandum in support of defendant's motion to dismiss; certificate of service - set for 10:30 1/14/02 before Judge Alan C. Kay (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of substitution by defendant United States of America; certificate of service - USA is substituted as defendant herein in place of defendant Michael T. Kato (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 1/14/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Notice of Removal
            NOTICE OF REMOVAL of civil action; certificate of Elliot Enoki; exhibit a; certificate of service - from Small Claims Division District Court of the Fifith Circuit, Koloa Division, State of Hawaii) Case Number: SC-K0-01-39 (lmg)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 129 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?