Method Of Determining The Carrier Reference Phase Of Coherent Demodulation Of Frequency Hopped Continuous Phase Modulated Signals With Synch Words Arbitrarily Located Within The Hop

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09312729
Examiner Young Toi Tse, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Young Toi Tse
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Holmes, Jack K., Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid +1 949 497 8800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Holmes, Jack K., Los Angeles, CA (US)
Filing Date May 14, 1999
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-341
Confirmation Number 2972
Group Art Unit 2634
Class / Sub-Class 375 / 133
Timeline
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Assignments (5) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of Acknowledgment Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Substitute Specification Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Referred by L&R for Third-Level Security Review. Agency Referral Letter Generated
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/14/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?