Imanil v. Ashcroft, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00670-SOM-BMK
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfredo Valdez Imanil, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Board Of Immigration Appeals, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Donald A. Radcliffe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/12/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Honolulu
Terminated 2/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case {}
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Judgment*
JUDGMENT in a Civil Case entered by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/gb that pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss" filed February 15, 2002, the case is dismissed and judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. (cc: all counsel) (gab)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway granting motion to dismiss [9-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for 2/25/2002 11:15 a.m. SOM is taken off calendar. Court to issue a written ruling. ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren granting motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff/petitioner [10-1] filed by petitioner (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP : rule 16 scheduling conference continued from 1/28/02 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 3/18/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff/petitioner [10-1] granted. attorney John Aaron Murphy Jones to prepare order to include notifying the pltf of his responsibilities as a pro se party. ( Ct Rptr : C6 Tape 1198) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant John Ashcroft, defendant Donald A. Radcliffe, defendant Board of Immigration; certificate of service (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                STATEMENT of no opposition by defendant to motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff/petitioner [10-1]; certificate of service (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 2/5/2002 Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Alfredo Valdez Imanil to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff/petitioner declaration of counsel; certificate of service; set for 2:00 1/25/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 2/15/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant John Ashcroft, defendant Donald A. Radcliffe, defendant Board of Immigration to dismiss memorandum in support of defendants' motion to dismiss; declaration of Anselmo A. Abramsen; certificate of service; set for 11:15 2/25/02 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Motion for Hearing on Petition for Habeas Corpus and Other Relief After Nolle Prosequi by the State of Hawaii on Petitioner's Vacated State Court Conviction-Both Motions are hereby Denied as being Moot. The Plaintiff has been released from INS Custody. Plaintiff's Counsel should follow up with the filing of proper Documents to the INS regarding Defendant's Status as to Immigration matters. cc:JohnAaron Murphy Jones and Mark Osaka ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001, Terminated: 11/2/2001 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Alfredo Valdez Imanil for temporary restraining order emergency motion for hearing on petition for habeas corpus and other relief after nolle prosequi by the state of Hawaii on petitioner's vacated State Court Conviction; declaration of counsel; exhibits 1 and 2; certificate of service; certified copy of Nolle Prosequi enclosed; set for 2:30 11/2/01 before Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order by Judge Susan O. Mollway re [1-1] (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway requiring plaintiff's counsel to submit a statement regarding plaintiff's present location (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EP : The Court held a telephone conference to attempt to set out a schedule for the motion for temporary restraining order. The court was unable to reach plaintiff's counsel but left messages for him at his office number and the number on his pleadings (which appeared to have been forwarded to counsel's mother on the mainland). In the meantime, the court does not assign a hearing date to the TRO motion, as it has not been established that an expedited hearing is necessary. ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER setting rule 16 scheduling conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/28/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  MEMORANDUM of law by plaintiff Alfredo Valdez Imanil in support of petition for writ of habeas corpus [1-1] and temporary restraining order; complaint for declaratory and/or injunctive relief including a emergency stay of deportation; exhibits 1 and 2; certificate of service (gab)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/17/2001 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                    PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS and Temporary Restraining Order; Complaint for Declaratory and/or injunctive relief including a emergency stay of deportation (gab)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?