Pasion v. Carvalho Enterprises
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00696-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Juliette Pasion, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sherman, Bruce F.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce F. Sherman bfs@bfshermanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Carvalho Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by lawcsilc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M. Lum +5225 522 522 5133 ksagena@lawcsilc.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/19/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 6/13/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Notice of Dismissal
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by plaintiff's with prejudice as to all claims and parties (sealed)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : ;Rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 6/5/02 ; status conference set for 9:00 7/5/02 ; the parties indicated that these cases will be settled within a week ( Ct Rptr : None) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 05/02/2002 09:00:00 AM to 06/05/2002 09:00:00 AM KSC. Bruce Sherman to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO : rule 16 conference set for 9:00 5/2/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 03/05/2002 09:00:00 AM to 04/17/2002 09:00:00 AM. Bruce Sherman to notify parties. Negotiating settlement. () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Certificate Of Service.
            CERTIFICATE of service (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                  RETURN OF SERVICE of first amended summons and first amended complaint executed upon defendant Carvalho Enterprises through service upon owner Douglas Carvalho on 10/25/01 (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 01/28/2002 09:00:00 AM to 03/05/2002 09:00:00 AM Bruce Sherman to notify parties. () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/28/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 168 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?