Santiago v. Dahlberg
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00697-SPK-KSC
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony A. Santiago, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Venetia K. Carpenter-Asui +5236 523 523 6446 vkcarpenter1@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Gregory R. Dahlberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/19/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 11/29/2002
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
101-cv-00618-SPK-KSC None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CONS, TERMED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 USCA Order
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: filed with lower court number CV 01-18SPK-KSC - (correct number CV 01-618SPK-KSC) - dismissing the appeal for failure to file the opening brief on appeal CA 03-15011 [40-1] in 1:01-cv-00697 - ( filed at 9CCA 9/12/2003; attest date 9/12/2003; filed in this district 9/15/2003) (sealed)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Notice of Appeal
    NOTICE OF APPEAL and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [41-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, [40-1] in 1:01-cv-00697 (cc: all counsel) (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Appeal - Miscellaneous
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697 from Dist. Court decision in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 [39-3] (cc: all counsel) (fe)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 USCA Appeal Fees
        RECEIVED re [41-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, re [40-1] in 1:01-cv-00697 fee in amount of $ 105.00 ( Receipt # 213151) (fe)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: 11/29/2002, Terminated: 11/29/2002 Judgment*
          Civil JUDGMENT:it is ordered and adjudged that judgment is entered pursuant to the "order granting defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment" on November 26, 2002; it is further ordered that the court grants defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment as to all claims - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/Laila M. Geronimo, Deputy Clerk - re [39-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, 1:01-cv-00697 terminating case 1:01-cv-00618 , terminating case 1:01-cv-00697 (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King granting motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, 1:01-cv-00697granting motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [24-1] in 1:01-cv-00697, 1:01-cv-00618 (cc: all counsel) (fe)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EP : Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (as to both cases) - oral argument held - these motions are hereby under submission to this court. - that the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [24-1] is submitted in 1:01-cv-00697, 1:01-cv-00618that the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [25-1] is submitted in 1:01-cv-00618, ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                Reply MEMORANDUM by defendant Gregory R. Dahlberg in 1:01-cv-00618, 1:01-cv-00697 in support of motion to dismiss or for judgment [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, [24-1] in 1:01-cv-00697; certificate of service (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                  SUPPLEMENT by plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697 to plaintiffs memorandum in opposition to defendants motion to dismiss; certificate of service [25-1] 1:01-cv-00618, 1:01-cv-00697 (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EO : Continued : Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment set for hearing on October 23, 2002 continued to November 22, 2002 @ll:00 a.m. before Judge Samuel P. King [24-1] in 1:01-cv-00697, 1:01-cv-00618 11:00 11/22/02 () JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (bbb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                      CONCISE STATEMENT OF FACTS by plaintiff in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff in 1:01-cv-00697 in opposition to motion to dismiss or for summary judgment; certificate of service [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, [24-1] in 1:01-cv-00697 (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff in 1:01-cv-00697 in opposition to motion to dismiss or for summary judgment; declaration of counsel; declaration of Martin Matautia; declaration of Tony Santiato; exhibits 1-2; certificate of service [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, [24-1] in 1:01-cv-00697 (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Amended Complaint
                          PLAINTIFF Martin U. Matautia in Civil 01-00618SPK-KSC, and PLAINTIFF Tony A. Santiago in Civil 01-00697SPK-KSC FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND for jury trial; summons (summons issued) - terminating defendant United States Army in 1:01-cv-00618; and modifying defendant title in Civil 01-00618SPK-KSC from Gregory R. Dahlberg, Acting Secretary of the Army TO Gregory R. Dahlberg, Acting Secretary of the Army, United States Army (afc)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            EO: The present Trial Date of November 13, 2002 and all other Scheduling Deadlines are hereby vacated. Listed below are the new Trial Date and al other Scheduling Deadlines- (This case is consolidated with CV NO. 01-00618SPK-KSC. Counsel are reminded that both Civil Numbers should be on all Documents that are filed in this Court.) 1. Jury trial on May 6, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on March 25, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by March 18, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings-Closed 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by February 5, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by December 4, 2002 8a. File Motions in Limine by April 15, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by April 22, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by November 4, 2002 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by December 4, 2002 12. Discovery deadline March 7, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for February 06, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by January 30, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by April 22, 2003 21. File Final witness list by April 15, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by April 8, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by April 15, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by April 22, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by April 15, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by April 22, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by April 22, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A cc: All Counsel by Fax [Jury Trial set for 9:00 5/6/03 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 before Judge Samuel P. King ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 3/25/03 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697; Discovery ddl set for 3/7/03 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697; Motion filing ddl set for 12/4/02 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697; settlement conference set for 2:00 2/6/03 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang] () JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION to file amended complaint and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : [28-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO :Settlement Conference set 7-24-02 has been vacated. Tom Helper to notify parties and will call the court to reset. (Helper out of town.) settlement conference (Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in 1:01-cv-00618, plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697 to amend complaint ; memorandum of law in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibita; certificate of service - set for 9:30 8/22/02 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002, Terminated: 11/26/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                      Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant United States Army in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant Gregory R. Dahlberg in 1:01-cv-00697 in support of motion to dismiss or for judgment [25-1] in 1:01-cv-00618; declaration of Thomas A. Helper; exhibits a, a1-a14, b, c, c1-c4, d, d1; certificate of service (fe)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002, Terminated: 11/26/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant United States Army in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant Gregory R. Dahlberg in 1:01-cv-00697 to dismiss or for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of defendant's motion; certificate of service - set for 11:00 10/23/02 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 before Judge Samuel P. King (fe)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION to extend deadline to file dispositive motions and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang : ; Motion filing ddl set for 6/19/02 in 1:01-cv-00618, in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant in 1:01-cv-00618, defendant in 1:01-cv-00697 (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to complaint by defendant to [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00618, to [1-1] in 1:01-cv-00697; certificate of service (fe)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      Revised CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697, plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in (bbb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        Revised CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Tony A. Santiago in 1:01-cv-00697, plaintiff Martin U. Matautia in (bbb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION to consolidate cases and ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King : consolidating CV 01-618 with CV 01-679, parties stipulate to consolidate the cases under the number & previously set schedule in the case with the lower court number (eps) Modified on 02/19/2002
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                    REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                      INITIAL DISCLOSURE; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          EP :EP Rule 16 Scheduling Conference 1. Jury Selection/Trial set for 11/13/2002 09:00:00 AM before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/01/2002 09:00:00 AM before KSC 4. File Final Pretrial Statement by 09/24/2002 5. File Motion to Join Added Parties/Amend Pleadings by 04/12/2002 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by 08/14/2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by set for 06/12/2002 8. File Motions in Limine by 10/22/2002 9. File Opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by 10/29/2002 11. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosure by 05/13/2002 12. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures by 06/12/2002 13. Discovery Deadline set for 09/13/2002 14. Settlement Conference set for 07/24/2002 01:30:00 PM before KSC 15. Settlement Conference statement by 07/17/2002 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case, Jury Instructions by 10/29/2002 21. File Final Witness List by 10/22/2002 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstative aids by 10/15/2002 25. File Stipulations re:Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by 10/22/2002 26. File objections to the Exhibits by 10/29/2002 28. File Deposition Excerpt Designation by 10/22/2002 29. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by 10/29/2002 30. File Trial Brief by 10/29/2002 Other: Parties to stipulate to consolidate with CV 01-00618SPK-KSC. ; Jury selection/Trial set for 9:00 11/13/02 before Judge Samuel P. King , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 10/1/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; settlement conference set for 1:30 7/24/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; file dispositive motions set for 6/12/02 ; Discovery ddl set for 9/13/02 ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER by defendant to [1-1]; certificate of service (tbf)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff; certificate of service (tbf)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Stipulation
                                                                                  STIPULATION to consolidate discovery with Tony A. Santiago vs. Gregory F. Dahlberg, Acting Secretary of the Army, United States Army, Civil No. 01-00697 DAE-BMK; certificate of service - (refer to CV 01-00618 SPK-KSC) (fe)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 1/28/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Complaint
                                                                                      COMPLAINT; demand for jury trial; summons (issued) (lmg)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?