Perot, et al v. Verizon Directories, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00702-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald Perot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Caprice R. Itagaki

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Joseph Gierlach +1 808 521 3336 gierlach33@aol.com
No Logo Yvonne Perot, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jay Green +5213 521 521 3336 +1 808 566 0347

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Caprice R. Itagaki

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Joseph Gierlach +1 808 521 3336 gierlach33@aol.com
v.
No Logo Doe Defendants 1-100, Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Verizon Directories Sales Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/24/2001
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Outside state of Hawaii
Terminated 12/19/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 10-1-2887-10[First Circuit]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 79 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION to dismiss complaint as to all claims and all parties with prejudice; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra - dismissing case - on behalf of defendant Verizon Directories (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 78 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Settlement on the Record-Case has Settled. Defendant's Counsel Tamara M. Gerrard stated the Settlement for the Record. Trial Date of December 02, 2003 has been vacated. Status Conference-regarding the filing of the Dismissal set for December 17, 2003 @9:00 a.m. before Judge Chang. (If a Dismissal has been submitted Court will enter an Order for Dismissal) status conference set for 9:00 12/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5, 1203) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
      LREF
      Blank 77 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : The ;settlement conference currently set for 11/17/03 at 2:30 PM before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang has been changed to a settlement on the record ; parties are close to settlement per defense counsel; cc: all parties via fax ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 76 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION to extend deadline to exchange exhibits and ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang - is hereby stipulated by and between plaintiffs and defendant that the deadlines to exchange exhibits shall be continued to 11/07/03 [75-2] (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 75 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO : Settlement Conference currently set for 10/31/2003 at 2:30 PM has been continued to 11/17/2003 at 2:30 PM before Judge Chang. cc: all parties via fax; settlement conference set for 2:30 11/17/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (sm)
            LREF
            Blank 74 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference held. Approximate length of trial - 6 days total Lay witnesses identified in the pretrial statements. No experts to be called. Due to client representative's family medical emergency, defense counsel may contact the Court about possibly rescheduling the Settlement Conference currently set for 10/31/03 at 2:30pm before Judge Chang Final pretrial conference; ;final pretrial conference held; rescheduling the settlement conference set for 2:30 10/31/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : C5-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 73 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Miscellaneous Document
              Amended Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiffs Ronald Perot and Yvonne Perot; certificate of service (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 71 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                Verizon Directories Sales Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT; certificate of service (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  Plaintiffs Ronald Perot and Yvonne Perot's final PRETRIAL STATEMENT; certificate of service (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 70 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                      LREF
                      Blank 69 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 68 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 67 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 66 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 65 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 64 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of settlement conference by plaintiff; certificate of service (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 63 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO :Settlement Conference is set for 10/31/2003 at 2:30 PM before Judge Chang. Betty from David Gierlach's office to notify all parties. settlement/status conference set for 2:30 10/31/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 62 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    EO :The time for the ; final pretrial conference set for 10/21/03 at 9:00 AM has been changed to 10/21/03 2:30 PM before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; cc: all parties via mail ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 61 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's motion for summary judgment by Judge David A. Ezra - granting in part and denying in part defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corp.'s motion for summary judgment [39-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 60 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 59 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Supplement
                                          Fourth SUPPLEMENT to initial disclosures by defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's; certificate of service [55-1] (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 58 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                            EP : Defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT Court to prepare order. that the motion for summary judgment [39-1] taken under advisement ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 57 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO :Defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's motion for summary judgment has been continued from 09/08/03 10:30 AM to 09/09/03 9:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra [39-1]; all counsel notified by phone ( Ct Rptr : CRT Reporter needed) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 56 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                EP : Settlement conference; ; settlement conference held ; further settlement conference to be scheduled following hearing on defendants' motion for summary judgment to be heard on 9/08/03 before Judge Ezra; parties to check with their respective clients regarding availability to travel to Hawaii for settlement conference and advise court to proposed dates for further settlement conference re [39-1] ( Ct Rptr : In chambers-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                  THIRD SUPPLEMENT TO INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by defendant Verizon Directories (eps)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (eps)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (eps)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (eps)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's motion for summary judgment filed July 1, 2003; declaration of Tamara M. Gerrard; exhibit A; certificate of service [39-1] (lmg)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    EO :The time the ; settlement conference set for 3:00 9/2/03 at 2:00 PM has been changed to 9/02/03 at 3:00 PM before Judge Chang ; cc: all parties via fax ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Supplement
                                                                      SECOND SUPPLEMENT to initial disclosures by defendant Verizon Directories Corporation's; certificate of service [35-1] (lmg)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs Ronald Perot and Yvonne Perot's in opposition to defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corp.'s motion for summary judgment, filed July 1, 2003 [39-1]; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                          Plaintiffs' COUNTER-STATEMENT of facts in OPPOSITION to defendant's motion for summary judgment, filed July 1, 2003 [39-1]; declaration of Ronald Perot; declaration of Yvonne Perot; declaration of David J. Gierlach; exhibits 1 through 7; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/16/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (lmg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Supplement
                                                                              Plaintiffs' second SUPPLEMENTAL disclosure; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003, Terminated: 9/11/2003 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Verizon Directories Corporation's for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 10:30 9/8/03 before Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                  Separate and concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Verizon Directories Corporation's in support of motion for summary judgment; declaration of Tamara M. Gerrard; exhibits A-K; certificate of service [39-1] (lmg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    EO : ;The settlement conference currently set for 7/31/03 at 2:00 PM has been continued to 9/2/03 at 2:00 PM before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; cc: all parties via fax ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                          First supplement to INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendant Verizon Directories; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (lmg)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (lmg)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                INITIAL DISCLOSURES by defendant Verizon Directories Sales Corporation's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Third amended rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Second amended rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (lmg) Modified on 03/05/2003
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        EP : Status Conference Re Dates - new dates given. Court to prepare a Second Amended Scheduling Order. 1. Jury trial on December 2, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on October 21, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by October 14, 2003 5. NA 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by September 3, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by July 2, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by November 12, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by November 19, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by June 2, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by July 2, 2003 12. Discovery deadline October 3, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for July 31, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by July 24, 2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by November 19, 2003 21. File Final witness list by November 12, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by November 4, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by November 12, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by November 19, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by November 12, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by November 19, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by November 19, 2003 ;Status conference re dates - new date given; court to prepare a second amended scheduling order , ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 12/2/03 before Judge David A. Ezra , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 10/21/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; settlement conference set for 2:00 7/31/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , ; Discovery ddl 10/3/03 ; file dispositive motions by 12/1/03 ( Ct Rptr : C5 no record) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg) Modified on 03/05/2003
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          EO : ;Status hearing re dates set for 02/27/03 8:30 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; Tamara Gerrard's office to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg) Modified on 02/20/2003
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Verizon Directories (fe)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Amended Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; Jury trial set for 9:00 8/5/03 ; Final pretrial conference set for 9:00 6/24/03 Discovery motions, shall be filed by 5/7/03 ; dispositive motions 3/5/03 (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                EP : Settlement Conference not held. New trial dates given: Amended Rule 16 Scheduling Order 1. Jury trial on August 5, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before DAE 2. Final Pretrial Conference on June 24, 2003 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by June 17, 2003 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by January 3, 2003 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by May 7, 2003 7. File Dispositive Motions by March 5, 2003 8a. File Motions in Limine by July 15, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by July 22, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by February 3, 2003 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 5, 2003 12. Discovery deadline June 6, 2003 13. Settlement Conference set for April 9, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by April 2,2003 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by July 22, 2003 21. File Final witness list by July 15, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by July 8, 2003 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by July 15, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by July 22, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by July 15, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by July 22, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by July 22, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A settlement conference 10/8/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang , Jury Trial set for 9:00 8/5/03 before Judge David A. Ezra , final pretrial conference set for 9:00 6/24/03 ; Discovery ddl set for 6/6/03 ; filing ddl set for 3/5/03 ; settlement/status conference for 2:00 4/9/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (fe) Modified on 10/11/2002
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                  Expert DISCLOSURES by plaintiffs Ronald Perot and Yvonne Perot's; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                      REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service - by plaintiffs (lmg)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                        Supplemental DISCLOSURES by plaintiffs'; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                          INITIAL DISCLOSURES by plaintiffs'; exhibit 1; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Description not available
                                                                                                                                            Supplemental DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES by plaintiff; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Ronald Perot and Yvonne Perot (fe)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                INITIAL DISCLOSURE by plaintiffs'; exhibit 1; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/7/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (fe)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                    EP :EP Rule 16 Scheduling Conf 1*. Jury Trial set for 02/04/2003 09:00:00 AM before DAE 2*. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/24/2002 09:00:00 AM before KSC 4 . File Final Pretrial Statement by 12/17/2002 5 . File Motion to Join Added Parties/Amend Pleadings by 07/05/2002 6 . File other Non-Dispositive Motions by 11/06/2002 7*. File Dispositive Motions by 09/04/2002 8a. File Motions in Limine by 01/14/2003 8b. File Opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by 01/21/2003 11a. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosure by 08/05/2002 11b. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures by 09/04/2002 12*. Discovery Deadline 12/06/2002 13*. Settlement Conference set for 10/08/2002 02:00:00 PM before KSC 14 . Settlement Conference statement by 10/01/2002 20 . Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case, Jury Instructions by 01/21/2003 21 . File Final Witness List by 01/14/2003 24 . Exchange Exhibit and Demonstative aids by 01/07/2003 25 . File Stipulations re:Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by 01/14/2003 26 . File objections to the Exhibits by 01/21/2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designation by 01/14/2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by 01/21/2003 29 . File Trial Brief by 01/21/2003 (Ct Rptr : No Record) JUDGE Mag Kevin S. Chang (fe)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant Verizon Directories; certificate of service (tbf)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                        REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff; certificate of service (fe)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Ronald Perot, plaintiff Yvonne Perot; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9:00 2/4/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Circuit action to federal court; exhibit a; certificate of service - Case Number: CV 01-1-2887-10 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?