Castro v. Aloha Airlines, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00786-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rohellio Castro, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Todd Withy +5212 521 521 2500 Withylawcourt@aol.com
v.
No Logo Aloha Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo Doe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Doe Corporations 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Doe Governmental Entities 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Elden Loeffelholz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman F. Amaguin +5241 524 524 1800 +5244 524 524 4591 rfa@ahfi.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com
No Logo Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 11/26/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Discrimination Against Handicapped Individuals
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Honolulu
Terminated 2/13/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 01-1-3189-12[FIRST CIRCUIT COURT]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 43 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice as to all claims and all parties; ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra - each of the parties to bear its own fees, costs and expenses of suit - dismissing case - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
    LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : Telephonic appearance by Todd Withy and Roman Amaguin; ; settlement put on the record , ; filing of dismissal moved from 2/14/03 to 9:00 2/25/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; all dates previously vacated ( Ct Rptr : C5 tape 985) Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : ;Settlement on record from 1/23/03 at 2:00 KSC to 8:30 the same day ; notified Withy thru secretary and Amaguin (Ct Rptr :) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
        NOTICE of hearing ; settlement on record is set for 2:00 1/23/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; parties to appear telephonically; notified Todd Withy and Roman Amaguin (lmg)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EO :Per Roman Amaguin's office case settled; ;filing of dismissal is set for 9:00 2/14/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; all dates vacated ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
            LREF
            Blank 38 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EP : ;further settlement conference held ; next conference on call ( Ct Rptr : None) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
              LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              EP : ; Final pretrial conference continued to 2:00 1/14/03 KSC; settlement conference set for 2:00 1/14/03 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : no recod) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                LREF
                Blank 36 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark Williams; certificate of service (lmg)
                  LREF
                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/31/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                  Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiff's Rohellio Castro; certificate of service (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion for summary judgment [23-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe) Modified on 12/10/2002
                      LREF
                      Blank 34 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      EP : Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' Motion for Summary Judgment. Arguments heard. Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' Motion for Summary Judgment-TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to prepare order. - taking under advisement on the motion for summary judgment [23-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (fe)
                        LREF
                        Blank 32 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Response - Miscellaneous
                        MEMORANDUM by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark - Williams RE: plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [29-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibits u and v; certificate of service (fe)
                          LREF
                          Blank 31 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Supplement
                          SUPPLEMENTAL declaration of G. Todd Withy by plaintiff re memorandum in opposition to defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' motion for summary judgment filed on 9/12/02, filed on 11/13/02 [29-1]; exhibits 5,8 & 9; certificate of service (fe)
                            LREF
                            Blank 30 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                            Concise STATEMENT of facts by plaintiff Rohellio Castro in opposition to defendants' Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' motion for summary judgment [23-1] (fe)
                              LREF
                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc.; Eden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' motion for summary judgment [23-1]; declaration of Rohellio Castro; declaration of G. Todd Withy; exhibits 1-16; certificate of service (fe)
                                LREF
                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EP : Settlement conference held; no settlement; ;next conference set for 2:30 10/29/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ( Ct Rptr : CRT Reporter needed) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EO :Continued: Defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' motion for summary judgment [23-1] from 11/18/02 10:30 AM to 12/2/02 11:15 AM ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding discovery by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 24 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                        DESIGNATION of expert witnesses by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz, Mark Williams'; certificate of service (lmg)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002, Terminated: 12/3/2002 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service - set for 10:30 11/18/02 before Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                            CONCISE STATEMENT of facts by defendants Aloha Airlines, Inc., Elden Loeffelholz and Mark Williams' in support of their motion for summary judgment; declaration of counsel; declaration of Bryan Tallo; declaration of Elden Loeffelholz delcaration of Gemma Rasa; exhibits a through T; certificate of service (lmg) Modified on 09/16/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 1/16/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark - Williams (sm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/10/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark - Williams (fe)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark - Williams (fe)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Description not available
                                                    EXPERT DISCLOSURES by plaintiff's (lmg)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: 7/19/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (lmg)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                  INITIAL DISCLOSURE by plaintiff Rohellio Castro (fe)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Initial Disclosure
                                                                    INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark Williams (afc)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - 1. Jury trial on February 19, 2003 at 9:00.a.m. before DAE Wednesday 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 7, 2003 at 9:00a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 31, 2002 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by July 19, 2002 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by November 20, 2002 7. File Dispositive Motions by September 18, 2002 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 28, 2003 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by February 4, 2003 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 19, 2002 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 18, 2002 12. Discovery deadline December 20, 2002 13. Settlement Conference set for October 21, 2002 at 2:00 p.m. before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by October 15, 2002 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by February 4, 2003 21. File Final witness list by January 28, 2003 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 21, 2003 25. File Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 28, 2003 26. File objections to the Exhibits by February 4, 2003 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 28, 2003 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by February 4, 2003 29. File Trial Brief by February 4, 2003 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by N/A [rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 11/26/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 2/19/03 before Judge David A. Ezra ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/7/03; Discovery ddl set for 12/20/02; Motion filing ddl set for 9/18/02; settlement conference set for 2:00 10/21/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang] (Ct Rptr: No Record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                          SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                            REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                              SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by defendant Aloha Airlines, Inc., defendant Elden Loeffelholz, defendant Mark - Williams (afc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Answer
                                                                                ANSWER by defendant Mark Williams to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Jury Demand
                                                                                  DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiff (afc)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Answer
                                                                                    ANSWER to complaint; certificate of service - by defendant Elden Loeffelhoz; defendant (Aloha Airlines, Inc.) [1-1] (afc)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/26/01 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (afc)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Circuit Court Case Number: 01-1-3189-12; exhibit a; certificate of service - by deft Aloha Island Air, Inc. (afc)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 205590 (afc)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Notice of Removal
                                                                                            Text not available.
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?