Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Post Issue Communication - Certificate of Correction
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to Publications
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Formal Drawings Required
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Formal Drawings Required
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Supplemental Response
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Examiner Interview Summary (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/7/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |