Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to Publications
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Disposal for a RCE / CPA / R129
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Affidavit(s) (Rule 131 or 132) or Exhibit(s) Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Continued Examination (RCE)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Request for RCE - Begin
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Petition Entered
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Date Forwarded to Examiner
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Response after Non-Final Action
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Non-Final Rejection
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |