Computer Peripheral Base Station For A Cordless Telephone
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09384309
Examiner Lester G Kincaid, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Peterson, Joe W., Applicant

Represented by Gambrell, Wilson & Hamilton, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY C. HOOD +1 512 853 8820
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Peterson, Joe W., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date August 26, 1999
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 5700-09600TT2063
Confirmation Number 7585
Group Art Unit 2685
Class / Sub-Class 455 / 462
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Assignments (10) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
    Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
      Issue Notification Mailed
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
        Receipt into Pubs
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
          Correspondence Address Change
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
            Receipt into Pubs
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
              Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                Receipt into Pubs
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Receipt into Pubs
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Fee Payment Received
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Issue Fee Payment Verified
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Workflow - Drawings Finished
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Receipt into Pubs
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Receipt into Pubs
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Dispatch to Publications
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Mail Notice of Allowance
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Mail Formal Drawings Required
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Formal Drawings Required
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 10/11/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Response after Non-Final Action
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/13/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Response after Non-Final Action
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                        Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                  Application Is Now Complete
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                        Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?