System And Method For Generating Personalized User Profiles And For

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09422286
Examiner Shahid Al Alam, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Shahid Al Alam
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Geller, Ilya, Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Geller, Ilya, Brooklyn, NY (US)
Filing Date October 21, 1999
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P68386
Confirmation Number 5357
Group Art Unit 2172
Class / Sub-Class 707 / 10
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Assignments (5) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Dismissed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Decision - Dismissed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Email Notification
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?