Cerna v. Barnhart, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00176-HG-BMK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Cerna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Thomas Moore +5260 526 526 0056 DTMLawoffice@gmail.com
v.
Social Security Administration Social Security Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jo Anne B. Social Security Administration"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 3/21/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 8/18/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER awarding Attorneys' Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Judge Helen Gillmor : re [17-1] (sm)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EO: Settlement Conference Re Attorney's Fees and Costs set for 12/04/2003 11:30:00 AM before BMK vacated. Per Moore, parties will stipulate to fees and costs.; settlement/status conference held 12/1/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EO : Settlement Conference Re Attorney's Fees and Costs set for 12/04/2003 at 11:30:00 AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Parties reminded that Local Rule 54.3 is still applicable. ; settlement conference set for 11:30 12/4/03 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        (Referral of motion for attorneys fees and costs) Elect to have Magistrate Judge adjudicate this moiton as special master. ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor cc: BMK, HG, CRM (sm)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff David Cerna for application for award of attorney fees and costs after favorable decision and entry of judgment ; memorandum in support; exhibits 1-5; declaration of Daivd Cerna; declaration of Doulgas Thomas Moore; certificate of service - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (sm)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
            JUDGMENT in a civil case by Judge Helen Gillmor granting order request for relief [15-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting request for relief by Judge Helen Gillmor re [12-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                LREF
                Blank 14 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                REPLY BRIEF by plaintiff David Cerna; Exhibits 1-2; declaration of Douglas Thomas Moore; certificate of service (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in support of defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; certificate of service - on behalf of defendant Barnhart (lmg)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002, Terminated: 8/4/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                    Opening BRIEF by plaintiff regarding [11-1]; exhibits 1-2; declaration of Douglas Thomas Moore; certificate of service (fe)
                      LREF
                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                      Second STIPULATION to continue all briefing deadlines; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - pltf's opening brief is continued from 10/16/02 to 11/15/02; deft's response brief is continued from 12/18/02 to 01/17/03; pltf's optional reply brief is continued from 01/17/03 to 02/17/03 - on behalf of deft (lmg)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Supplement
                        SUPPLEMENTAL certification dated October 3, 2002; certificate of service - by defendant (lmg)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                          TRANSCRIPT of the administrative record, date September 24, 2002 - by defendant (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Answer
                            ANSWER to complaint [1-1]; certificate of service - by defendant Jo Anne B. Barnhart (lmg)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                              STIPULATION to continue all briefing deadlines; ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - ddls are continued as set forth: a) pltf's opening brief continued from 09/16/02 to 10/16/02; b) dft's response brief is continued from 11/18/02 to 12/18/02; c) pltf's optional reply brief is continued from 12/18/02 to 01/17/03 - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - on behalf of defendant (lmg)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  EP : ; Rule 16 conference held ; briefing schedule: opening briefs due 9/16/02; response due 11/18/02; reply due 12/18/02; parties will notify court in a week if a hearing date is requested ( Ct Rptr : Chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                    SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT for plaintiff; certificate of service (lmg)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by defendant; certificate of service (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 6/17/02 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Filing Fee Received
                                            FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 207740 (afc)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?