Campbell v. Chow, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00294-DAE-LEK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William H.C. Campbell, Jr., Petitioner
No Logo A. Chow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M Duffy , +1 202 307 6406 +1 202 307 0054 Charles.M.Duffy@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo John/Jane Does, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/15/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7609 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 10/15/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Dismiss" filed on September 24, 2002 re [9-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002, Terminated: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra granting defendants' motion to dismiss [6-1] (cc: all counsel) (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      EP : Government's Motion to Dismiss. Court made a call in the hall for Pro Se William H.C. Campbell, Jr.-NO response. Government's Motion to Dismiss-GRANTED. Court to prepare order [6-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO : Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 08/12/2002 09:00:00 AM to 11/18/2002 09:00:00 AM, LEK. Charles Duffy to notify William Campbell. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002, Terminated: 9/24/2002 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant A. Chow to dismiss ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Allan Chow; certificate of service - set for 9:00 9/23/02 before Judge David A. Ezra (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER consolidating petitioner's cases by Judge David A. Ezra - petitioner's MISC 02-00076DAE-BMK is closed and merged into CV 02-00294DAE-LEK (cc: all counsel) (eps)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant A. Chow on 5/15/02 through U.S. Attorney, 300 Ala Moana Blvd., PJKK Bldg., Room 6100, through Suzette Tagalog (fe)
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/12/02 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (fe)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Summons Issued
                  SUMMONS issued as to defendant A. Chow (fe)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Complaint
                    PETITION to Quash Summons (fe)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 81 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?