Hanzawa v. Federal Bureau of In, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-00340-SOM-KSC
District Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George K. Hanzawa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Turk +5217 521 521 7555
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Leah M. Meisel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Mueller, Robert S., III Mueller, Robert S., III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert S. Mueller, III"
United States Department of Justice Special Counsel, United States Department of Justice, May 17, 2017 - Present
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2001 - September 4, 2013

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 6/5/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 9/4/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal without prejudice and ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway : terminating case (gab)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/30/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP : rule 16 scheduling conference not held on 9:00 8/28/02 stipulation to dismiss without prejudice to be filed. Filing of dismissal is set for 09/27/02 at 9:00 KSC. ( Ct Rptr : in chambers no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
      Rule 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa; certificate of service (gab)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Scheduling Conference Statement
        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Federal Defendants; certificate of service (gab)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Miscellaneous Document
          WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa withdrawing motion for preliminary injunction [2-1] (gab)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            EO : Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for hearing on Monday, August 12, 2002 before Judge Mollway is hereby taken off per Plaintiff's Counsel David Turk's request. (This was per LawClerk Neill Tseng) All Counsel notified of this hearing being taken off. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002 Report of Planning Meeting
              REPORT OF the PARTIES PLANNING MEETING by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa; certificate of service (gab)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Certificate Of Service.
                Amended CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Federal Bureau of In, defendant Robert S. Mueller III, defendant Leah M. Meisel (gab)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  MEMORANDUM by defendant Federal Bureau of In, defendant Robert S. Mueller III, defendant Leah M. Meisel in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [2-1]; certificate of service (gab)
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of change of address by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa; certificate of service (sealed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Susan O. Mollway denying motion for temporary restraining order [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (gab)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Response - Miscellaneous
                        MEMORANDUM by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa in response to declaration of Thomas A. Helper regarding plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order; certificate of service (gab)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Description not available
                          DECLARATION of Thomas A. Helper regarding plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order; certificate of service (gab)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Service - Miscellaneous
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon U.S. Attorney's Office on 6/5/02 (gab)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Response - Miscellaneous
                              MEMORANDUM of clarification by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa; certificate of service (gab)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EP : Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Arguments. Mr. Helper to file a declaration tomorrow re: if Mr. Schubert had proposed to the FBI personnel officer that the plaintiff be placed on indefinite suspension. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - taken under advisement. Court to issue a written ruling. ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                  LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa of intent to rely on uncited authority; certificate of service (sealed)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/12/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Description not available
                                    Notice of Filing Original DECLARATION of Edward M. Broussard; Declaration of Edward M. Broussard; certificate of service (gab)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Reply
                                      REPLY Memorandum by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa in support of motion for temporary restraining order; certificate of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Defendants' MEMORANDUM in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order [3-1]; declaration of Edward M. Broussard; exhibit 1; certificate of service (gab) Modified on 06/12/2002
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/7/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          EP : Telephone Conference held in Chambers - Discussion held re: scheduling of the motion for temporary restraining order. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 6/12/02 @ 2:00 p.m. SOM. Government to file a response by 4:30 p.m. Friday, 6/7/02. Plaintiff to file a reply by 4:30 p.m. Monday 6/10/02. Both parties to address the issue of whether or not the Court has jurisdiction. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 8/12/02 @ 11:15 a.m. SOM. ( Ct Rptr : In Chambers) JUDGE Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab) Modified on 06/12/2002
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/28/02 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab) Modified on 06/12/2002
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 6/14/2002 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa for temporary restraining order memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order; declaration of George K. Hanzawa; exhibit a-m; proposed temporary restraining order; certificate of service; referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2002 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff George K. Hanzawa for preliminary injunction memorandum in support of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction; declaration of George K. Hanzawa; exhibits a-m; certificate of service; referred to Judge Susan O. Mollway (gab)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Complaint
                                                  Verified COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; exhibits a-m; (Summons(es) issued) (gab)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 245 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?